judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEVIN M. EDDINGTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0116
Short Caption:KEVIN M. EDDINGTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9908-88Filed Date:02/09/1989

Opening Event Date:02/09/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/29/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/03/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKevin M. Eddington N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EDDINGTON, KEVIN M. UNITED STATES
02/09/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/16/1989DESIGNATION OF RECORD GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD DSA
02/17/1989ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (10 PGS - BURNS) (RTC) JB PANEL SCDATE 033089 SCHPRD R
06/29/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/29/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/29/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(82 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 072089 SCHPRD RT
08/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-8-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 080889 SCHPRD BA
08/11/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTION FOR AN EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRF TO 9/8/89. PB PANELRBH SCDATE 080989 SCHPRD V
09/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/10/89 (NO OPE) GY PANEL SCDATE 090889 SCHPRD BA
09/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/13/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
10/13/1989ORDER GRANT MO TO DISMISS & DISMISS APPEAL. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD M
10/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
11/03/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD