judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES PARKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0094
Short Caption:JAMES PARKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M8088-88Filed Date:01/17/1989

Opening Event Date:01/17/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/12/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/10/1990
Argued/Submitted:05/02/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Parker N
David W. Windley YN
AppelleeUnited StatessN
Geoffrey G. Bestor YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PARKER, JAMES UNITED STATES
01/17/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID W. WINDLEY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/17/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD DSA
07/05/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (180 PGS RT - SIMMS) GT PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD R
08/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 15, 1989 RJG PANEL SCDATE 081489 SCHPRD BA
08/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/15/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 081589 SCHPRD OPE
09/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 13TH (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 091589 SCHPRD BA
09/12/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLA MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/13/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD M
09/12/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (5 PGS. -- SWAGERTY) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 101389 SCHPRD BA
11/08/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-7-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 111489 SCHPRD BE
11/28/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/07/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 112189 SCHPRD V
12/05/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 1-10-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 120789 SCHPRD BE
12/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 01/10/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 120689 SCHPRD V
01/10/1990FiledBriefing Completed
01/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 011090 SCHPRD BE
01/10/1990MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION STIPULATION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON APPEAL. CWC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990ORDER GRANTING THE STIPULATION & DIRG CLK TO SUPP RECORD WITH ATTACHED EXHIBITS. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (EXHIBITS AS OUTLINED IN 1/10/ 89 STIPULATION) FVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/02/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/02/1990SUBMITTED PANELFESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
06/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD