judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TONY EVERETTE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0166
Short Caption:TONY EVERETTE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M10651-88Filed Date:02/03/1989

Opening Event Date:02/03/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/27/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/27/1990
Argued/Submitted:06/19/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/11/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTony Everette N
Howard F. Bramson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
James F. Rutherford YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EVERETTE, TONY UNITED STATES
02/03/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/14/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) HOWARD F. BRAMSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/02/1989RECEIVED CERTIFICATION FROM RPTR SWAGERTY OF 11/16 THRU 11/17/ 88 PROC (TO LEWIS 3/1/89) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 040489 SCHPRD R
10/27/1989FiledRecord Completed
10/27/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/27/1989COURT REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT (192 PGS/LEWIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 082889 SCHPRD RT
12/06/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 120689 SCHPRD BA
01/02/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 1, 1990 NO OPA AJ PANEL SCDATE 011090 SCHPRD BE
01/12/1990ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING APLE'S BR TO AND INCLUDING 2/1/90. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/01/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL FEBRUARY 2, 1990 AJ DAS PANEL SCDATE 020190 SCHPRD BE
02/02/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990FiledBriefing Completed
02/27/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 022290 SCHPRD V
06/19/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/19/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1990SUBMITTED PANELFESCRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
07/11/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD