judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GREGORY R. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0162
Short Caption:GREGORY R. WILLIAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M8230-88Filed Date:02/02/1989

Opening Event Date:02/02/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/06/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGregory R. Williams N
Richard A. FinciNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILLIAMS, GREGORY R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: LACEY MCCEACHIN, JR. NOTE - 01
02/02/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/22/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO FILE DSA OR APPEAL MAY STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 040389 SCHPRD R
07/19/1989RECEIVED COPY OF LETTER DATED 6/27/89 FROM ATTORNEY FINCI TO APPEL- LANT MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/11/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/11/1989ORDER THAT THIS APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED. PB PANELRO SCDATE 072189 SCHPRD V
08/11/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
09/06/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/06/1989RECEIVED SR #1 (304 PGS. -- JACKSON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD