judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ABDUL AL QAWEE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1542
Short Caption:ABDUL AL QAWEE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F20613-77Filed Date:12/21/1989

Opening Event Date:12/21/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/04/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAbdul Al Qawee N
Barbara L. Smith NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901QAWEE, ABDUL AL AKA SAMUEL YOUNG UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 SEE 8901541 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 2/28/90 ORD: DENYING MO TO NOTE - 02 DISMISS W/OUT PREJ TO RENEWAL NOTE - 03 W/IN 20 DAYS PROVIDED APLT NOTE - 03 SUBMITS A STMT IN ACCORDANCE NOTE - 04 W/ JOHNSON V. U.S. NOTE - 04
01/12/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD R
01/16/1990$50.00 DOCKETING FEE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD DSA
02/28/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02-04 CWC PANELRO SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD TO
04/17/1990RECEIVED APLT'S STMT IN 89-1463 IN ACCORDANCE WITH JOHNSON V. US RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1990STATEMENT APLT STATEMENT IN 89-1532 IN ACCORDANCE W/JOHNSON V. US. AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S PRO SE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO DISMISS; DISMISSING APPEAL. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
07/04/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/16/1990RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: DISMISSAL OF APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/12/1990RECEIVED PRO SE LETTER FROM APPELLANT RE: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (?) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/25/1990LETTER TO APLT RE 9/2/90 LTR TO CJ RE MOT FOR RECONSIDERATION; REFERRED TO ATTY. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/22/1991RECEIVED LETTER OF APLT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/12/1991ORDER DENY MO OF APLT TO RECALL THE MANDATE. DAS PANELFESCPY SCDATE 053191 SCHPRD VS