judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES V. ANDRE BENNETT

Case Information: 89-CM-0119
Short Caption:UNITED STATES V. ANDRE BENNETTClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M15360-85Filed Date:01/18/1989

Opening Event Date:01/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/03/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeAndre Bennett N
William E. Seals NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES BENNETT ANDRE
01/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/15/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) WILLIAM E. SEALS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO FILE DOCKETING STATEMENT FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/21/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 032089 SCHPRD R
06/22/1989ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE THE DSA W/IN 10 DAYS OR APPEAL MAY STAND DISMISSED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/13/1989ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
01/03/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD