judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARK HOLBROOK V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0117
Short Caption:MARK HOLBROOK V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Weapons Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F9687-88Filed Date:01/24/1989

Opening Event Date:01/24/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/11/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/19/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMark Holbrook N
Joseph H. Green, Jr.YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Patrice I. Kopistansky YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HOLBROOK, MARK UNITED STATES
01/24/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/15/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOSEPH H. GREEN, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD DSA
06/23/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 032789 SCHPRD R
07/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 080289 SCHPRD BA
08/18/1989ORDER APLT BRF DUE IN 40 DAYS. (NO RT ORDERED) ACG PANELRO SCDATE 072189 SCHPRD U
09/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 092789 SCHPRD BA
10/26/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO FOR EXT TO FILE BR; APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 092189 SCHPRD U
01/23/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (7 PGS. -- SCHOCH) RJG PANEL SCDATE 021690 SCHPRD RT
02/11/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 030590 SCHPRD BA
03/19/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-19-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 031990 SCHPRD BE
03/28/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/19/90; NFX. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 032190 SCHPRD V
04/19/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/19/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 041990 SCHPRD BE
09/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/14/1990SUBMITTED PANELFEBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFEBEMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD