judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD EDWARD BELL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0086
Short Caption:DONALD EDWARD BELL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M14438-86Filed Date:01/17/1989

Opening Event Date:01/17/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/29/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/01/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/13/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonald Edward Bell N
Monoranjan Bezboruah YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David A. Payne YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BELL, DONALD EDWARD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: ISSAC R. LAWSON NOTE - 01 JACQUELINE HARGRAVES & NOTE - 02 RONALD HUMPHRIES NOTE - 02 NOTE - 03 CON 89-32 & 89-44 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 09/11/89 ORD: PREPARE & NOTE - 04 TRANSMIT RECORD W/OUT FEE NOTE - 05 FORTHWITH. BA SHALL BE FLD 40 NOTE - 05 DAYS FROM DATE RECORD IS FLD; NOTE - 06 BE SHALL BE FILED W/IN 30 DAYS NOTE - 06 FROM DATE BA FILED. NOTE - 07 5/15/90 ORD: SS, CONS 89-44 NOTE - 07 WITH 89-32 & 89-86; GRANT MO'S NOTE - 08 OF APLTS TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & NOTE - 08 BRFS OF APLTS IN 89-32 & 89-44 NOTE - 09 ARE TO BE FL BY 5/20/90; GRANT NOTE - 09 MO OF APLT IN THIS CASE FOR LV NOTE - 10 TO FL THE BRF & CLK TO FL BA. NOTE - 10 NOTE - 11 6/15/90 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 11 IN 89-32 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF NOTE - 12 TO 6/18 & VACATE APPMT OF NOTE - 12 DAVID NIBLACK & REFERR MATTER NOTE - 13 TO BPR; APPT DONNIE E. WILSON NOTE - 13 FOR APLT IN 89-32; DAVID NOTE - 14 NIBLACK TO TRANSMIT TO NEW NOTE - 14 COUNSEL ALL PAPERS NECESSARY NOTE - 15 FOR COUNSEL'S USE IN CASE; BRF NOTE - 15 OF APLT IN 89-32 DUE IN 40.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/02/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MABRYR FOR - APLT HARGROVES ATTY 2 - BEZBORUAHM FOR - APLT BELL ATTY 3 - PAYNED FOR - APPELLEE
01/17/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MONORANJAN BEZBORUAH, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD DSA
02/27/1989RECEIVED CT RPTR CALHOUN CERTIFICATION OF 6/17/87 PROCEEDING (CASE NOT ON CALENDAR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1989RECEIVED CERTIFICATION FROM RPTR CALHOUN OF 6/17/87 PROC. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (IN 89-32) #1 (21 PGS - WILLIAMS) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (597 PGS - HAWKINS)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (38 PGS - HART)(SEE RECORD IN 89-44 FOR RT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(597 PGS/HAWKINS) AD (SEE 89-32 FOR RT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (54 PGS - FRANKLIN)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (48 PGS - ASHBOCK) JB (SEE 89-32 FOR RT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (32 PGS - FARMER)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (66 PGS - BURNEY)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 89-32 & 89-86 FOR ALL PURP; DIRG CLK, SUPER CT TO (SEE NOTES 4-6) ACG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989FiledRecord Completed
09/29/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 100189 SCHPRD CHECK
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (68 PGS - TROUPE)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 110889 SCHPRD BA
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (IN 89-44) (41 PGS - RAMOS) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (3 PGS - TROUPE)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/26/1990ORDER GRANTG MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXT BRIEFS OF BOTH APLTS DUE IN 40 DAYS. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD OPE
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (32 PGS - FARMER)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 6, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 6, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 030790 SCHPRD BA
04/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/6/90 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 89-44 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FELDS 07-10. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 042090 SCHPRD V
06/11/1990ORDER BA DUE IN 89-32 BY 6/14 OR COUNSEL'S NAME WILL BE REMOV- ED FROM CJA LIST. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD B
06/15/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11-15. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 061490 SCHPRD BA
07/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION IN 89-32 RG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO & BRF OF APLT IN NO. 89-32 TO BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 8/28/90; NFX. GW PANELFF SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD V
08/27/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 89-32 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/01/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/01/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100190 SCHPRD BE
10/02/1990STATEMENT OF APLE COUNTERSTATEMENT OF THE CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/13/1991ARGUED PANELFEBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1991AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART JUDG ON APPEAL WAS AFF. AS TO LAWSON & HARGROVES, REV & REM ANDED AS TO BELL. AD PANELFETEBE SCDATE 021391 SCHPRD RDEC
08/21/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE AND REMANDED
08/21/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2184
09/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD