judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONNELL JONES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0149
Short Caption:DONNELL JONES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M8427-88Filed Date:02/03/1989

Opening Event Date:02/03/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/31/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/03/1990
Argued/Submitted:11/14/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/06/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonnell Jones N
Richard E. HollidayYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Eric M. Acker YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, DONNELL UNITED STATES
02/03/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/15/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD E. HOLLIDAY, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1989FiledRecord Completed
07/31/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/31/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (44 PGS, 179 PGS/SWAGERTY) AD PANEL SCDATE 040489 SCHPRD R
09/06/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 091189 SCHPRD BA
09/15/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXTENT BRF DUE BY 10/11/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 091889 SCHPRD CHECK
10/11/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 101189 SCHPRD BA
04/09/1990ORDER APPELLEE IS DIRECTED TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 111589 SCHPRD BE
05/03/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/03/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AND APPENDIX FOR APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD BE
11/14/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/14/1990SUBMITTED PANELFETEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELFETEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/06/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD