judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL A. PEOPLES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0033
Short Caption:MICHAEL A. PEOPLES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M9132-88Filed Date:12/28/1988

Opening Event Date:12/28/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/05/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/20/1989
Argued/Submitted:04/05/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/15/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael Peoples N
John C. Krollman YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Richard L. Edwards YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PEOPLES, MICHAEL A. UNITED STATES
12/28/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/27/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN C. KROLLMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS AD PB PANEL SCDATE 020689 SCHPRD DSA
02/16/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT PB PANEL SCDATE 021689 SCHPRD N
06/05/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/05/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/05/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (291 PGS/SCHERTZER) AD PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD R
07/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-02-89 (NO OPPO) AD PANEL SCDATE 071789 SCHPRD BA
07/17/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTION FOR AN EXT OF TIME TO FILE BRF TO 8/16/89 PB PANEL SCDATE 071189 SCHPRD V
08/16/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-2-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 081689 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/2/89; NFX. MEH PANELDDW SCDATE 083089 SCHPRD M
10/02/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 10 DAYS TO OCTOBER 12TH JB PANEL SCDATE 100289 SCHPRD BA
10/12/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 101289 SCHPRD BA
10/12/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/12/89; NFX. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 101689 SCHPRD OPE
11/16/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12-13-89 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD BE
11/22/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/13/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 111789 SCHPRD V
12/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 20, 1989 NO OPPO AJ PANEL SCDATE 121389 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1989ORDER GRANT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF TO 12/20/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 121489 SCHPRD V
12/20/1989FiledBriefing Completed
12/20/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 122089 SCHPRD BE
04/05/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/05/1990SUBMITTED PANELRGSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELRGSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/24/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/15/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD