judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ISAAC RUDOLPH LAWSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0032
Short Caption:ISAAC RUDOLPH LAWSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M14439-86Filed Date:12/21/1988

Opening Event Date:12/21/1988Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/15/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/01/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/13/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantIssaac Rudolph Lawson N
David C. Niblack NN
AppellantUnited StatesN
Donnie E. Wilson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
David A. Payne YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LAWSON, ISAAC RUDOLPH UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 89-44 & 89-86 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 09/11/89 ORD: IS DIRECTED TO NOTE - 02 PREPARE & TRANSMIT RECORD IN NOTE - 03 89-86 W/OUT FEE FORTHWITH; BA NOTE - 03 OF APLTS TO BE FILED W/IN 40 NOTE - 04 DAYS FROM DATE ON WHICH RECORD NOTE - 04 IS FILED; BE TO BE FILED W/IN NOTE - 05 30 DAYS FROM DATE BA FILED. NOTE - 05 NOTE - 06 5/15/90 ORD: SS, CONS 89-44 NOTE - 06 WITH 89-32 & 89-86; GRANT MO'S NOTE - 07 OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & NOTE - 07 BRFS OF APLTS IN NOS. 89-32 & NOTE - 08 89-44 DUE BY 5/20/90; GRANT NOTE - 08 MO OF APLT IN NO. 89-86 FOR LV NOTE - 09 TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BRF OF NOTE - 09 APLT IN 89-86. NOTE - 10 6/11/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 10 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO NOTE - 11 EXTENT THAT THE BA BE FL BY NOTE - 11 6/14/90; NFX; FAILURE TO FL NOTE - 12 BRF WILL RESULT IN HIS NAME NOTE - 12 BEING REMOVED FROM CJA LIST. NOTE - 13 6/15/90 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 13 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 6/18 & NOTE - 14 APPMT OF DAVID NIBLACK VACATED NOTE - 14 & THIS MATTER REFERRED TO BPR; NOTE - 15 DONNIE WILSON APPTD FOR APLT; NOTE - 15 DAVID NIBLACK TO TRANSMIT TO NOTE - 16 NEW COUNSEL ALL PAPERS NECES- NOTE - 16 SARY FOR COUNSEL'S USE IN CASE NOTE - 17 BRF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. NOTE - 17
01/01/1906 NIBLACKD VACATED 6/15/90.
12/21/1988FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/03/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID C. NIBLACK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD DSA
05/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(21 PGS/WILLIAMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(597 PGS/HAWKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 032589 SCHPRD RT
06/14/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD R
06/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (38 PGS - HART)(SEE RECORD IN 89-44 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/23/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (597 PGS - HAWKINS) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/05/1989RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM HAWKINS - 6/24/89 PROCEEDING JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989RECEIVED COPY OF LTR TO P. SANBORN FROM A. ALEXANDER PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (54 PGS. -- FRANKLIN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (48 PGS - ASHBOCK) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (32 PGS - FARMER) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (66 PGS - BURNEY) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING 89-32 & 89-86 FOR ALL PURP; ORD THAT CLERK, SUPER CT (SEE NOTES 2-5) ACG. PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/29/1989RECORD ON APPEAL IN NO. 89-86. AD PANEL SCDATE 100189 SCHPRD CHECK
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (68 PGS - TROUPE) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/08/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (IN 89-44) (41 PGS - RAMOS) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (3 PGS - TROUPE) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/26/1990ORDER GRANTG MO IN 89-86 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO EXT BRFS OF APLTS IN BOTH CASES DUE IN 40. CWC PANELRO SCDATE 112089 SCHPRD OPE
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(32 PGS. -- FARMER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 6, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 030790 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 04/06/90 (NFX) JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF IN 89-86 TO 5/6/90 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-6-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 040690 SCHPRD BA
05/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 20, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN 89-86 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1990RECEIVED APLT'S BRIEF IN 89-86 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 89-86. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 89-44 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 06-09. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 042090 SCHPRD V
05/21/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-27-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 052090 SCHPRD BA
05/29/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-1-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 4, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/04/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-7-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 6-14-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10-12. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD B
06/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 18, 1990 AJ PANEL SCDATE 061490 SCHPRD BA
06/15/1990FiledRecord Completed
06/15/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DONNIE E. WILSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/15/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13-17. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 062690 SCHPRD OPE
07/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION IN 89-44 & 89-86 RG PANEL SCDATE 072590 SCHPRD BA
08/21/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO & BRF OF APLT IN NO. 89-32 TO BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 8/28/90; NFX. GW PANELFF SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD V
08/27/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 082890 SCHPRD BA
10/01/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/01/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100190 SCHPRD BE
10/02/1990STATEMENT OF APLE COUNTERSTATEMENT OF THE CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1991MOTION TO SUBMIT WITHOUT ARGUMENT APPELLANT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/12/1991ORDER APLT'S MOT TO SUBMIT W/O ARGUMENT GRANTED. MEH PANELFEBETE SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD VS
02/13/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/13/1991SUBMITTED PANELFEBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1991AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART THE JUDGMENT ON APPEAL WAS AFF.AS TO LAWSON & HARGROVES, REVERSED & REM. AS TO BELL. AD PANELFETEBE SCDATE 021391 SCHPRD RDEC
08/21/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 596 A.2d 504 AND REMANDED
08/21/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2184 OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2184
09/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD