judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROBERT EARL CURRY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0168
Short Caption:ROBERT EARL CURRY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M10068-88Filed Date:02/10/1989

Opening Event Date:02/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/24/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRobert Earl Curry N
Barbara E. SosnickNN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CURRY, ROBERT EARL UNITED STATES
02/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BARBARA E. SOSNICK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/20/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO FL DSA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APT SHOULD NOT BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 033189 SCHPRD DSA
06/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (41 PGS. -- J&J) (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 041189 SCHPRD R
08/24/1989FiledRecord Completed
08/24/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/24/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(135 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 071989 SCHPRD RT
10/12/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 ADDITIONAL DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 100389 SCHPRD BA
10/19/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/20/89. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 101789 SCHPRD M
10/25/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11-27-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 102089 SCHPRD BA
11/14/1989ORDER EXTG TIME FOR FILING BA TO AND INCLUDING 11/27/89. NFX FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/05/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS 1/4/90 AJ PANEL SCDATE 112789 SCHPRD BA
01/04/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/11/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
01/11/1990ORDER GRANT MO TO WITHDRAW & DISMISS APPEAL. GW PANELRO SCDATE 010890 SCHPRD V
01/11/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
02/01/1990MANDATE ISSUED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD