judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ABDON J. EGAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0167
Short Caption:ABDON J. EGAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M12302-88Filed Date:02/10/1989

Opening Event Date:02/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/21/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/08/1990
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/12/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAbdon J. Egan N
Brian C. Plitt YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Kathleen A. Felton YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EGAN, ABDON J. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/21/90 ORD: REMAND CASE TO NOTE - 01 TRL CRT FOR DETERMINATION AS NOTE - 02 TO WHETHER THE POLICE ACTION NOTE - 02 WAS UNREASONABLE W/IN THE NOTE - 03 MEANING OF THE 4TH AMENDMENT. NOTE - 03
02/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/28/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BRIAN C. PLITT, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/13/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 031089 SCHPRD DSA
06/19/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 041189 SCHPRD R
07/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FORTY(40)DAYS FROM 9/21/89 GT PANEL SCDATE 073189 SCHPRD BA
08/24/1989ORDER GRANT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 10/31/89. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 081789 SCHPRD V
08/24/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(66 PGS/BURNEY) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 103189 SCHPRD BA
02/21/1990FiledRecord Completed
04/09/1990ORDER APPELLEE IS DIRECTED TO FILE BRIEF W/IN 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER JB PANELRBH SCDATE 120589 SCHPRD BE
05/08/1990FiledBriefing Completed
05/08/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD BE
08/16/1990ORDER APLT TO SHOW CAUSE W/IN 20 DYS WHY CASE SHD NOT BE REMANDED AS PER APLE'S BRIEF. CWC PANELBESTSC SCDATE 073090 SCHPRD VS
09/21/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
09/21/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELBESTSC SCDATE 050890 SCHPRD READY
09/21/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE
10/12/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD