judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TYRONE MARTIN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1523
Short Caption:TYRONE MARTIN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3792-88Filed Date:12/26/1989

Opening Event Date:12/26/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/05/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/18/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/07/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/19/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTyrone Martin N
James W. KleinNY
Robert L. Wilkins YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
James N. Plamondon NN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MARTIN, TYRONE UNITED STATE
01/01/1902APLE'S PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC RE: ANSA FILED 2/25/92
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 01/12/90 ORD: JAMES KLEIN, NOTE - 01 ESQ. APPTD TO REPT. APLT; DSA NOTE - 02 IN 89-1523 SHALL BE FLD W/IN NOTE - 02 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03 CON: 89-885 NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 10/26/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 04 BY 10/10/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 05 BY 01/14/91; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 05 02/04/91; SCHED CASE ON NOTE - 06 MARCH 1991 CAL; NFX NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 12/13/90 ORD: 10/26/90 ORD IS NOTE - 07 VACATED; GRANT MO OF APT TO NOTE - 08 EXT TM & BRF OF APLT DUE BY NOTE - 08 1/3/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 09 2/7/91; REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 09 BY 2/26/91; SCHED CASE ON MAY NOTE - 10 1991 CAL. NOTE - 10 NOTE - 11 12/28/90 ORD: CRT'S ADVANCED NOTE - 11 BRFG ORD OF 10/26/90, IS VAC; NOTE - 12 GRANTG APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL NOTE - 12 BRF & BRF DUE 2/4/91; BRF OF NOTE - 13 APLE DUE 3/12/91; & RBA DUE NOTE - 13 4/1/91; CASE TO REMAIN SCHD NOTE - 14 FOR CONSID ON 5/91 CAL. NFX. NOTE - 14 NOTE - 15 2/8/91 ORD: 12/28/91 ORD IS NOTE - 15 VACATED; GRANT MO OF APLT TO NOTE - 16 EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/11/91; NOTE - 16 BRF OF APLE DUE 3/18/91 & NOTE - 17 REPLY BRF OF APLT DUE 4/8/91; NOTE - 17 SCHED CASE ON MAY CAL; NFX.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/05/07 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - WILKINSR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - PLAMONDONJ FOR - APPELLEE
12/26/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/12/1990ORDER SS CONSOLIDATING APPEALS 89- 885 & 89-1523 FOR ALL PURP; FO (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/22/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD DSA
02/27/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 022690 SCHPRD R
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #9 (57 PGS. -- SCHERTZER) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (23-PGS/WATKINS) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #10 (169-PGS/HUNT) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990RECORD COMPLETED
03/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 040690 SCHPRD BA
05/22/1990ORDER APLT TO FILE STATEMENT W/IN 10 DAYS WHETHER RT WILL BE ORDRD & COMPLETION DATE JB PANELRBH SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD U
06/01/1990STATEMENT RE; TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 061090 SCHPRD STATE
06/13/1990ORDER APLT'S BRF SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DS FRM DATE OF THIS ORD. GR PANELDDW SCDATE 060590 SCHPRD DDW
07/18/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT FOR: 3/20, 21 & 23 1989. RJG PANEL SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD BA
08/10/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 080190 SCHPRD U
08/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(344 PGS/BURNS) AD SEE 89-885 PANEL SCDATE 101790 SCHPRD RT
09/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (ORDER OF JUDGE WOLF DATED 7/30/90) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04 - 06 FOR ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE PANELRBH SCDATE 082490 SCHPRD GR
12/03/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO VACATE BRIEFING SCHD & TO ISSUE NEW BRIEFING SCHEDULE AD PANEL SCDATE 121090 SCHPRD BA
12/13/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-10. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 090490 SCHPRD CHECK
12/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO FEBRUARY 4, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 010391 SCHPRD BA
12/28/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 11 THRU 14 GW PANELRO SCDATE 122090 SCHPRD CHECK
01/29/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #12(9 PGS/WILLIAMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/04/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2-11-91 NO PPO AD PANEL SCDATE 020491 SCHPRD BA
02/08/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 15-17. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD TO
02/11/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 021191 SCHPRD BA
03/18/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 031891 SCHPRD BE
03/18/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/16/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/16/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/19/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S UNOP MOT FOR LV TO FILE LODGED REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 041691 SCHPRD VS
04/19/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 042691 SCHPRD CHECK
05/07/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/07/1991ARGUED PANELSCWGPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/07/1991MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/13/1991ORDER GRANT MOT OF ROBERT LEON WILKINS, ESQ. TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AT ARGUMENT. MEH PANELSCWAPY SCDATE 052091 SCHPRD OPE
07/03/1991RECEIVED 213 PAGES OF TRANSCRIPT DATED 3/30-31/1989 FROM MARIA GOAD AND GIVEN TO ASSIGNED JUDGE SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/30/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (10 PGS. -- GRIMES) PROC. 4/15/91 PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/30/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (7 PGS/GRIMES) 4/7/88 - PROC. DTE. PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING SUP REC #5 TO ASSIGNED JUDGE. MEH PANELJAC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/30/1991REVERSED AND REMANDED JGMT OF CONVICTIONS ARE RV AND CASES ARE REMANDED FOR NEW TRIAL. AC PANELSCWAPR SCDATE 060791 SCHPRD RDEC
12/30/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -SW CITE
12/30/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - SW PAGE # - 4147 OPINION TYPE D JUDGE - WA PAGE # - 0000
01/13/1992MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APLE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1992ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET AND PET FOR REH/REH EB DUE ON OR BEFORE 1/27/92 SL PANELRO SCDATE 012592 SCHPRD CHECK
01/27/1992PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC AJ PANEL SCDATE 012792 SCHPRD MRRB
02/05/1992ORDER THAT APLT W/I 20 DAYS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH/REH EB (10 COPIES) SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/25/1992APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR REHEARING/ REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 022592 SCHPRD ANSA
05/08/1992ORDER DENY APPELLEE'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC Associate Judge Farrell has recused from this case. Associate Judge Wagner voted to grant rehearing and Associate Judges Terry, Wagner, and Sullivan voted to grant rehearing en banc. (EB)
05/19/1992MANDATE ISSUED