judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO NUGENT

Case Information: 38100
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO NUGENTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D258706Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/18/2002 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:09/18/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/28/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/28/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11020
07/11/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-11682
07/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12854
09/11/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date appellant has failed to file the docketing statement. Counsel for appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against him. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-15320
11/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Denying Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Imposing Sanctions. On July 11, 2001, respondent moved to dismiss this appeal. We deny respondent's motion to dismiss. We conclude that the imposition of sanctions is appropriate. We direct attorney David Amesbury to personally pay the sum of $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library. Attorney Amesbury shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file proof with this court's clerk the he has paid the sanctions. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file the docketing statement and to file a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. Appellant shall have 70 days from the date of this order within which to file the opening brief. Briefing thereafter shall proceed under NRAP 31(a)(2). We caution attorney Amesbury that failure to timely comply with this order may result in the imposition of additional sanctions, including dismissal of this appeal. 01-18974
11/29/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Payment of Sanction. David C. Amesbury - check no. 000525183 in the amount of $500.00. This document was not in the file when it was scanned. 01-20006
11/29/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-20007
11/29/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order filed November 14, 2001. 01-20008
12/03/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 20, 2001. To Court Reporter: Debbie Casper. 01-20224
12/12/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Request for Transcripts of Proceedings. Due date: 10 days.
12/21/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Certificate of Mailing via Facsimile & Regular Mail (Request for Transcript). 01-21583
01/14/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. This document was not in the file when it was scanned. 02-00942
01/24/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-01680
02/28/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-03706
03/01/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 14, 2002, Transcript/Video Services filed a motion for an extension of time to file the transcript. Transcript/Video Services shall prepare and file the requested transcript within 7 days from the date of this order. On January 24, 2002, appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. fn1[In the motion, appellant states that the request is made pursuant to NRAP 31(a)(1). We remind counsel for appellant that appeals involving the custody or visitation of minor children, including appeals seeking termination of parental rights, are governed by the expedited briefing schedule of NRAP 31(a)(2).] We grant the motion. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix by March 29, 2002. 02-03770
03/07/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant the motion filed February 28, 2002. Transcript Video Services shall have until March 27, 2002, to file and serve the requested transcripts. Further, appellant shall have until April 16, 2002, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31 (a)(2). 02-04124
03/11/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: April 20, 2001. Court Reporter: Florence Hoyt. 02-04400
04/03/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 03/29/02. Signed by: David C. Amesbury. 02-05933
04/03/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 02-05934
04/17/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Interdepartmental mail. Signed by Brigid J. Duffy. 02-06855
04/17/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-06858
05/09/2002Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
07/25/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on September 18, 2002, at 10:30 a.m. (SNP03-MS/ML/NB)
09/03/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
09/18/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
10/18/2002Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed." Before Shearing, Leavitt and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 118 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 65. SNP03 02-18126
11/12/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-18199
11/12/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 14, 2002. 02-18199