judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JOHN D. STULL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-162)
Case Number:06-162Case Docketed On:07/13/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:JOHN D. STULL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JOHN D. STULL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJohn D. StullKenneth M. Koski
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/13/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/13/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/13/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/29/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
08/30/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
10/13/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/16/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/29/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/30/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
01/02/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with wavier (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
01/03/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/03/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/05/2007Notice-Incoming - Waiver of appeal (original)Notice-IncomingWaiver of appealFinal