judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CRYSTAL LINDER V. RANDY LEWIS, ET AL.,

Case Information: 10-CV-0889
Short Caption:CRYSTAL LINDER V. RANDY LEWIS, ET AL.,Classification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2123-09Filed Date:07/14/2010

Opening Event Date:07/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/01/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/09/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/29/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/28/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCrystal Linder YPro SeN
AppelleeRandy Lewis NPro SeN
AppelleeBig "e" Towing CompanyNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/10/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 14, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was granted in forma pauperis status in the trial court, and it further appearing that transcript may be needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that appellant shall within 10 calendar days from the date of this order, file with the Court Reporting Division a motion for preparation of transcripts of proceedings in the Superior Court, with notice to appellee(s), for determination in accordance with Hancock v. Mutual of Omaha Ins. Co., 472 A.2d 867 (D.C. 1984). See D.C. App. R. 10(b)(5)(A). The Court Reporting Division will submit the motion to the appropriate judge for a decision as to whether transcripts will be provided at no cost. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall simultaneously submit a file-stamped copy of that motion with this court. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
08/18/2010RECEIVED- motion for appeal transcript (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 6/30/10) (elp)
10/01/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (36-pgs/tape 6/30/10 proc.)w/ cd attached
10/01/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/06/2010RECORD INDEX
10/06/2010RECORD COPIES
10/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
10/13/2010APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION- to correct the caption of case
11/04/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion to remove David Brown as a party to this appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that David Brown was dismissed in the trial court, and it further appearing that appellee Big E Towing Company is a business that must be represented by counsel, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and David Brown is dismissed as a party to this appeal and the case caption is amended as shown above. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellee Big E Towing shall within 15 days from the date of this order advise this court as to the identity of its counsel. See Moore Energy Resources, Inc. v. Public Serv. Comm'n of the District of Columbia, 785 A.2d 300,304 (D.C. 2001); D.C. App. R. 3 (c)(2). Failure to comply with this order may result in appellee Big E Towing being prohibited from filing its brief. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix remain due to be filed with this court on or before November 16, 2010. (ETW) elp
11/15/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF no appendix
11/22/2010 It appearing that the brief of appellant was filed with this court on November 15, 2010, and it further appearing that the limited appendix was due to be filed on or before November 16, 2010, but the limited appendix has not been filed, see D.C. App. R. 30, 31, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the limited appendix accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the limited appendix or request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date the limited appendix is filed with this court. (JAC) elp
12/13/2010 On consideration of this court's order of November 22, 2010, directing appellant to submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, and it appearing that appellant has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (ETW) elp
12/13/2010DISMISSED
12/16/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REINSTATE APPEAL w/appendix attached to motion (service perfected by the Court) ta
01/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion, construed as motion to reinstate appeal, to which no opposition has been filed, and the lodged limited appendix, and it appearing that appellee Big E Towing Company has failed to identify counsel, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and this appeal is hereby reinstated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file the lodged limited appendix. It is (MORE)
01/11/2011APPENDIX - (LIMITED)
01/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee Randy Lewis shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW) elp
02/15/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 11, 2011, directing appellee Randy Lewis to file the brief within 30 days from the date of the order, and it appearing that the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee Randy Lewis shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the brief, accompanied by the motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC)
03/09/2011 On consideration of this court's order of February 15, 2011, which directed appellee Randy Lewis to submit his brief within 15 days from the date of the order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time, but it appearing that the brief has not yet been filed, and upon further consideration of this court's order of November 4, 2010, which directed Big E Towing Company to identify its counsel within 15 days from the order, and it appearing that appellee Big E Towing has failed to comply with the order, it is ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on appellant's brief alone. (ETW) elp
03/09/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/22/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
06/22/2011LETTER from Appellant requesting permission to have Appellee subpeonaed before the court and for his personal identification number (SS) for wage garnishment. *Construed as a motion for discovery (elp)
06/28/2011 On consideration of appellant's letter filed on June 22, 2011, construed as a motion for discovery, and it appearing that this court reviews only the record from the trial court, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion for discovery is denied. (ETW) elp
07/28/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
08/02/2011FiledReceived ORDER dated 6/28/11, mailed to Big "E" Towing at P.O. Box 441011, Fort Washington, MD, 20744, and returned by the U.S. Postal Office as "undeliverable" and forwarded to files this date. elp (Appellee Big "e" Towing Company)
09/29/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, Ruiz, Newman
10/06/2011FiledReversed And Remanded (MOJ) (Thompson, Associate Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and Newman, Senior Judge.)
10/28/2011FiledMandate