Case: 13-04-00093-CV
13-04-00093-CV
02/19/2004
Unknown Civil Case Type.
MICHAEL GOODE
WILLIAM P. SAGE AND MICHAEL MANNING
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/24/2005 | Record sent to storage | | |||
08/16/2005 | Copy of Letter | | |||
12/03/2004 | Record sent to storage | | |||
09/13/2004 | Record Sent | | |||
09/09/2004 | Mandate Issued | | |||
07/12/2004 | Miscellaneous Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
06/08/2004 | Miscellaneous Motion | | |||
05/06/2004 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||
04/29/2004 | CHECKOUT SHT FOR REQUESTED DOCUMENTS | | |||
03/15/2004 | Affidavit Filed | | |||
03/08/2004 | Green card in | | |||
03/04/2004 | Letter sent | | |||
02/19/2004 | request for documents | | |||
02/19/2004 | 10 day letter sent | | |||
02/19/2004 | Notice of appeal received | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
09/09/2004 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sage, William P. | Appellee | Howard R. Marek |
Goode, Michael | Appellant | Michael Goode |
Manning, Michael | Appellee | Howard R. Marek |
Trial Court Information
24th District Court
Victoria
Honorable Joseph P. Kelly
01-3-56,131-A