judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHARLES E. MCGRIER, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1519
Short Caption:CHARLES E. MCGRIER, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F171-88Filed Date:12/26/1989

Opening Event Date:12/26/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/02/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/29/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/21/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCharles E. Mcgrier, Jr.N
James W. KleinNY
Hiram E. Puig-Lugo YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Ann K. H. SimonYN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MCGRIER JR., CHARLES E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/04/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - PUIG-LUGOH FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SIMONA FOR - APPELLEE
12/26/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/08/1990ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 011890 SCHPRD DSA
01/25/1990DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR CALHOUN CERTIFICATION OF 2/2/89 - 2/3/89 PROCEEDING (DUPLICATE REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 022690 SCHPRD R
05/10/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (67-PGS/SWARINGER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(394 PGS/MILLER) AD PANEL SCDATE 051890 SCHPRD RT
06/28/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (160 PGS & 28 PGS - CALHOUN PF PANEL SCDATE 051790 SCHPRD RT
07/02/1990FiledRecord Completed
07/02/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO COMPLETION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 081390 SCHPRD BA
07/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(99 PGS/CALHOUN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO STAY BRFING TO EXTENT BRIEF IS FILED W/IN 40 DAYS FROM DATE OF ORD JB PANELRBH SCDATE 080790 SCHPRD U
10/16/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 31, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 101590 SCHPRD BA
10/18/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (15 PGS. -- CALHOUN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/31/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 14, 1990 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/15/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF (MXBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO X TM FL LODGD BRF FO BE SHALL BE FLD W/IN 30 DYS FRM DT OF ORD. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 110790 SCHPRD GR
12/28/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JANUARY 29, 1991 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 123190 SCHPRD BE
01/25/1991ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRF TO 01/2I/91; NFX GR PANELFF SCDATE 010991 SCHPRD GR
01/29/1991FiledBriefing Completed
01/29/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 012991 SCHPRD BE
03/28/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF APPELLANTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S UNOPPOSED MOT FOR LV TO FILE LODGED REPLY BRF. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 040191 SCHPRD VS
04/03/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 040891 SCHPRD CHECK
04/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/12/1991ARGUED PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/17/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (ORDER OF J. SCOTT DATED 6/11/91) PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELTESTPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/24/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE 597 A.2d 36
09/24/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2746
10/09/1991MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC TO OCTOBER 18, 1991 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1991ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET AND PET FOR REH/REH EB DUE ON OR BEFORE 10/18/91 SL PANELRO SCDATE 102191 SCHPRD OPE
10/21/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD