judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HUBERT GUILLARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0043
Short Caption:HUBERT GUILLARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M8182-88Filed Date:01/05/1989

Opening Event Date:01/05/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/16/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/20/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/04/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHubert Guillard N
Boniface K. CobbinaYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Bernadette SargeantYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901GUILLARD, HUBERT UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 02/21/89 ORD - VACATED & NAME NOTE - 01 REMOVED FROM CJA PANEL. FVH NOTE - 02 O9/14/90 ORD: GRANTG APLT'S MO NOTE - 02 TO THE EXTENT THAT COUNS FOR NOTE - 03 APLT FL BRF W/IN 10 DAYS. NOTE - 03 FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN NOTE - 04 APPOINTMENT BEING VACATED. NOTE - 04
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/03/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - COBBINAB FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SARGEANTB FOR - APPELLEE
01/05/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/27/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BONIFACE K. COBBINA, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA OR SHOW CAUSE WHY APTMT SHOULD NOT BE PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD DSA
06/16/1989FiledRecord Completed
06/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL GT PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD R
07/18/1989ORDER DENY MO TO EXT TM TO COMPLETE RT; RT DUE 7/31/89. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (23 PGS RT - DAVIS) GT PANEL SCDATE 103089 SCHPRD RT
01/23/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/23/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (752 PGS. -- MITCHELL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 073190 SCHPRD RT
05/22/1990ORDER DIRG APLT TO FILE HIS BRIEF W/IN 30 DAYS OR STMT W/IN 20 RE ADDITIONAL TRANSC. FVH PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/02/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO COMPL W/5/22/90 ORD W/IN 10 DAYS OR APTMT TO BE VACATED. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/09/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO TO X TM TO FL BR TO EXTENT BRF BE FLD W/IN 10 DYS FRM DATE OF ORD. NFX GR PANELRBH SCDATE 080190 SCHPRD GR
08/20/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (?) AD PANEL SCDATE 082090 SCHPRD BA
09/14/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 THRU 04 GW PANELRO SCDATE 091190 SCHPRD V
10/02/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO (15) DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10/29/90 AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/29/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 5, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 12, 1990 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/13/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MOS TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & LODGED BRF IS FILED. BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 111990 SCHPRD OPE
12/20/1990FiledBriefing Completed
12/20/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 122090 SCHPRD BE
03/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/12/1991ARGUED PANELBESTSC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1991REVERSED AND REMANDED JUDGMENT RV JUDGMENT ON APPEAL /CAUSE RM FOR A NEW TRIAL PANELSTSCBE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/13/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - RVRM METH -OPN JUDGE -BE CITE 596 A.2d 60
09/13/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - BE PAGE # - 2629
10/04/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD