judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JACQUELINE YVONNE HARGROVES V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0044
Short Caption:JACQUELINE YVONNE HARGROVES V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M14436-86Filed Date:01/10/1989

Opening Event Date:01/10/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/22/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/01/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/13/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJacqueline Yvonne Hargroves N
Ralph Thomas Mabry YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David A. Payne YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HARGROVES, JACQUELINE YVONNE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: DONALD BELL, RONALD NOTE - 01 HUMPHRIES & ISSAC LAWSON NOTE - 02 02/21/89 ORD - WHY APTMT SHLD NOTE - 02 NOT BE VACATED & NAME REMOVED NOTE - 03 FROM CJA PANEL. FVH NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 5/15/90 ORD: SS, CONS 89-44 NOTE - 04 WITH 89-32 & 89-86; GRANT MO'S NOTE - 05 OF APLTS TO EXT TM TO FL BRF NOTE - 05 & BRFS OF APLTS IN 89-32 & NOTE - 06 THIS CASE DUE BY 5/20/90; GRNT NOTE - 06 MO OF APLT IN 89-86 FOR LV TO NOTE - 07 FL BRF & CLK TO FL BRF OF APLT NOTE - 07 IN 89-86. NOTE - 08 CON 89-32 & 89-86 NOTE - 08 NOTE - 09 6/15/90 ORD: DENY MO OF APLT NOTE - 09 IN NO. 89-32 TO EXT TM TO FL NOTE - 10 BRF TO 6/18 & APPMT OF DAVID NOTE - 10 NIBLACK VACATED & DONNIE E. NOTE - 11 WILSON APPTD FOR APLT; MATTER NOTE - 11 REFERRED TO BPR; DAVID NIBLACK NOTE - 12 TO TRANSMIT TO NEW COUNSEL THE NOTE - 12 REC & ANY PAPERS NECESSARY FOR NOTE - 13 COUNSEL'S USE IN CASE; BRF OF NOTE - 13 APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS.
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/02/13 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - MABRYR FOR - APLT HARGROVES ATTY 2 - BEZBORUAHM FOR - APLT BELL ATTY 3 - PAYNED FOR - APPELLEE
01/10/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/27/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RALPH THOMAS MABRY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989ORDER DIRG COUNSEL TO FILE DSA W/IN 10 DAYS OR SHOW CAUSE WHY (SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 & 3) PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GT PANEL SCDATE 030689 SCHPRD DSA
05/11/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (IN 89-32) #1 (21 PGS - WILLIAMS) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (597 PGS - HAWKINS)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/16/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (38 PGS - HART) JB PANEL SCDATE 030989 SCHPRD R
06/23/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(597 PGS/HAWKINS) AD (SEE 89-32 FOR RT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AD PANEL SCDATE 072689 SCHPRD BA
08/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (54 PGS - FRANKLIN)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD (IN 89-32 & 89-86) #4 (48 PGS ASHBOCK)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (32 PGS - FARMER)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/05/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (66 PGS. -- BURNEY) RJG (SEE 89-32 FOR RT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BA UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT DOCKETED. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(68 PGS/TROUPE-J&J-TAPE) AD (SEE 89-32 FOR RT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/22/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD 41 PGS/RAMOS AD PANEL SCDATE 122089 SCHPRD RT
12/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (3-PGS/TROUPE) AJ (SEE 89-32 FOR RT) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (32 PGS - FARMER)(SEE 89-32 FOR RT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1990ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 10 DAYS OR REFER TO BPR. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD BA
04/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 5-6-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 042790 SCHPRD BA
05/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 89-86. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-07. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD CHECK
06/11/1990ORDER BA IN 89-32 DUE BY 6/14 OR COUNSEL'S NAME WILL BE REMOV- ED FROM CJA LIST. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 060490 SCHPRD B
06/15/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 09-13. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 061490 SCHPRD BA
07/27/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR A 30 DAY EXTENSION IN 89-32 JT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT MO & BRF OF APLT IN NO. 89-32 TO BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 8/28/90; NFX. PANELFF SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD V
08/27/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 89-32 AD PANEL SCDATE 082890 SCHPRD BA
10/01/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/01/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 100190 SCHPRD BE
10/02/1990STATEMENT OF APLE COUNTERSTATEMENT OF THE CASE AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/13/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/13/1991ARGUED PANELFEBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1991AFFIRMED IN PART/REVERSED IN PART JUDG ON APPEAL WAS AFFIRMED AS TO LAWSON & HARGROVES, REV & REMANDED AS TO BELL. AD PANELFETEBE SCDATE 021391 SCHPRD RDEC
08/21/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AFRV METH -OPN JUDGE -TE CITE AND REMANDED
08/21/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - TE PAGE # - 2184
09/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD