judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ARTIS M. WALKER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1530
Short Caption:ARTIS M. WALKER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8984-88Filed Date:12/29/1989

Opening Event Date:12/29/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/28/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/26/1990
Argued/Submitted:03/12/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/12/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantArtis M. Walker N
Barbara R. Miller YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
John W. Kern YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALKER, ARTIS M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CON 89-1531 NOTE - 01
12/29/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/10/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BARBARA R. MILLER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD DSA
02/28/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/28/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 022890 SCHPRD R
03/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(159 PGS/RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD RT
05/30/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(17 PGS/GRAYBILL) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8-15-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD BA
07/17/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/15/90; NFX. GW PANELFF SCDATE 071690 SCHPRD V
07/27/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 081590 SCHPRD BA
08/30/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9-28-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 080390 SCHPRD BE
09/18/1990ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 9/28/90. NFX. JJ PANELFF SCDATE 091390 SCHPRD B
10/01/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10-2-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 092890 SCHPRD BE
10/02/1990RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/26/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF GW PANEL SCDATE 101890 SCHPRD V
11/29/1990ORDER SS, CONSOL 89-1530 & 89-1531. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1991LETTER FROM APPELLANT'S COUNSEL RE: CALENDAR SCHEDULING RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/12/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/12/1991SUBMITTED PANELRGTEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELRGTEWG SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/22/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/12/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD