judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALI M. HATCHER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1529
Short Caption:ALI M. HATCHER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Lead: 89-CF-1516 Consolidated:89-CF-1529
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F11968-87Filed Date:12/29/1989

Opening Event Date:12/29/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/22/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/14/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/01/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/26/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAli M. Hatcher N
Gregory C. Powell YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Kenneth F. Whitted YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HATCHER, ALI M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/REG
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 10/10/91 ORD: CONS.W/89-1516. NOTE - 01 BA IN 89-1529 DUE IN 10 OR NOTE - 02 VACATE. BE DUE 30 DAYS NOTE - 02 THEREAFTER. AD NOTE - 03 CONS. 89-1516 NOTE - 03
12/29/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL in 89-CF-1529.
01/24/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GREGORY C. POWELL, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS TIME HAVING EXPIRED JB PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD DSA
02/26/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/05/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 022890 SCHPRD R
03/19/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT GW PANEL SCDATE 031690 SCHPRD V
07/31/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (178-SHELTON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 052590 SCHPRD RT
10/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (36-PGS/CALHOUN) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/22/1990RECORD COMPLETED
07/19/1991ORDER BRF OF APLT DUE BY 9/11/91; BRF OF APLE DUE BY 10/11/91. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 062891 SCHPRD U
09/17/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 10 DAYS. PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/20/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL WITH NUMBER 89-1516 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1-2. AD PANELRO SCDATE 100191 SCHPRD TO
10/16/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 102191 SCHPRD BA
11/14/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 112191 SCHPRD BE
11/14/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/01/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/01/1992ARGUED JJ WG KG SU Catherine Ann Brown, Esq. for appellant Rushing; Gregory C. Powell, Esq. for appellant Hatcher; Kenneth Whitted, Esq. for appellee.
01/12/1993AFFIRMED: MOJ affirming judgments of conviction and remanding cases for correction of the judgment and commitment orders. (WAKGSU)
02/26/1993MANDATE ISSUED