judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VERLITA M. RUSHING V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1516
Short Caption:VERLITA M. RUSHING V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Lead:89-CF-1516Consolidated: 89-CF-1529
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F14427-87Filed Date:12/22/1989

Opening Event Date:12/22/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/18/1991Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/14/1991
Argued/Submitted:05/01/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/26/1993

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantVerlita M. Rushing N
Catherine Ann Brown YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Kenneth F. Whitted YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901RUSHING, VERLITA M. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902SCRND/REG
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/12/90 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 02 VACATE APPMT OF DONNIE WILSON NOTE - 02 & APPT CATHERINE BROWNING FOR NOTE - 03 APLT; COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL A NOTE - 03 STATE IN 10 AS TO STATUS OF NOTE - 04 PENDG RT. NOTE - 04 NOTE - 05 5/2/91 ORD. BA DUE 7/16, BE NOTE - 05 DUE 8/20, RBA DUE 9/9, NFX; NOTE - 06 TO BE SCHD ON NOVEMBER CAL. NOTE - 06 NOTE - 07 7/26/91 ORD: GRANT MO OF APLT NOTE - 07 TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 8/2/91; NOTE - 08 BRF OF APLE DUE BY 9/6/91 & NOTE - 08 REPLY BRF OF APLT, IF ANY, DUE NOTE - 09 BY 9/25/91; CASE TO REMAIN NOTE - 09 SCHED ON NOV 1991 CAL; NFX. NOTE - 10 9/11/91 ORD: GR MO OF APLT FR NOTE - 10 LV TO FL BRIEF; LODGED BRIEF NOTE - 11 IS FILED; BRF OF APLE DUE BY NOTE - 11 10/7/91; REPLY BRF OF APLT, IF NOTE - 12 ANY, DUE BY 10/25/91; CASE NOTE - 12 SCHED ON DEC 1991 CAL.; NFX. NOTE - 13 10/10/91 ORD: CONSL W/89-1529. NOTE - 13 BA IN 89-1529 DUE IN 10 OR NOTE - 14 VACATE. BE DUE 30 DAYS NOTE - 14 THEREAFTER. NOTE - 15 CONS. 89-1529 NOTE - 15
01/01/1906 WILSOND VACATED 4/12/90
12/22/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL in 89-CF-1516.
01/10/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DONNIE E. WILSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 012290 SCHPRD DSA
03/05/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD R
03/06/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR SHELTON CERTIFICATION OF 5/9/90 PROC. (TRIAL BEGIN 5/10/90) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1990COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS DONNIE E. WILSON FOR APPELLANT AND TO SUBSTITUTE CATHERINE BROWNING AS COUNSEL RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) CATHERINE ANN BROWN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-04. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 040990 SCHPRD CHECK
04/12/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (71 PGS. -- SHELTON) RJG PANEL SCDATE 071990 SCHPRD RT
05/08/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APLT FOR LEAVE TO LATE FILE STATE AD PANEL SCDATE 040190 SCHPRD STATE
05/08/1990RECEIVED STATE RE PREPARATION OF TRANSCRIPTS AD PANEL SCDATE 040190 SCHPRD STATE
05/09/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR SHELTON CERTIFICATION OF 5/9/89 PROCEEDING (ORDER CANCELLED) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (196 PGS. WATKINS) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/11/1990STATEMENT OF APPELLANT ON STATUS OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/13/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(208 PGS/HUNT) AD PANEL SCDATE 060190 SCHPRD RT
06/14/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 062190 SCHPRD CHECK
06/25/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 072490 SCHPRD BA
07/02/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (18 PGS.--K.E.JACKONS) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/23/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELRBH SCDATE 071290 SCHPRD U
07/30/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPT AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/21/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE BRIEF, BRIEF DUE W/IN 40 DAYS AFTER RT FILED JB PANELFF SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD U
08/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(19 PGS/RONAN) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (21 PGS. -- VAN BREMEN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 052091 SCHPRD RT
04/18/1991RECORD COMPLETED in 89-CF-1516.
05/02/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 5-6. AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/2/91 -- NO OPPO PMB PANEL SCDATE 071891 SCHPRD BA
07/26/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 07-09. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/07/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/12/91 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1991ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 5 DAYS OR APPMT WILL BE VA- CATED. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 080991 SCHPRD Q
08/21/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO AUGUST 23, 1991 RJG PANEL SCDATE 082091 SCHPRD BA
08/27/1991ORDER CNSL FOR APLT TO FL BRF IN 5 DAYS OR APPMT WILL BE VACATED. DAS PANELTE SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD OPE
08/29/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 090391 SCHPRD BA
08/29/1991RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF EVH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/11/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 10-12. EVH PANELRBH SCDATE 090691 SCHPRD BE
09/20/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THIS APPEAL WITH NUMBER 89-1529 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/10/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 13-14. AD PANELRO SCDATE 100191 SCHPRD TO
10/16/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 89-1529 AJ PANEL SCDATE 102191 SCHPRD BA
11/14/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 112191 SCHPRD BE
11/14/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/01/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/01/1992ARGUED JJ WG KG SU Catherine Ann Brown, Esq. for appellant Rushing; Gregory C. Powell, Esq. for appellant Hatcher; Kenneth Whitted, Esq. for appellee.
01/12/1993AFFIRMED: MOJ affirming judgments of conviction and remanding cases for correction of the judgment and commitment orders. (WAKGSU)
02/26/1993MANDATE ISSUED