judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MAURICE A. WARD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1505
Short Caption:MAURICE A. WARD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1387-88Filed Date:12/22/1989

Opening Event Date:12/22/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/20/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/29/1991
Argued/Submitted:03/24/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/21/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMaurice A. Ward N
Thomas T. HeslepYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Julie G. Weidenbruch YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WARD, MAURICE A. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CONSOL: 90-24 NOTE - 01
12/22/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/02/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS T. HESLEP, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD DSA
02/28/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD R
03/14/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(3 PGS/HUNT) AD PANEL SCDATE 040790 SCHPRD RT
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2( 60-PGS/SHELTON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (168-PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AJ PANEL SCDATE 062690 SCHPRD RT
05/10/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (298 PGS - MOORE) SEE 90-24 FOR RT GG PANEL SCDATE 062790 SCHPRD RT
06/22/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF CT RPTR WRAY TO EXT TIME TO FILE 9/13/89 - 9/15/89 PROC TO JULY 25TH JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1990ORDER GRANT CT RPTR WRAY MO TO EXT TIME TO FILE 9/13/89 - 9/15/89 RT, RT DUE JULY 25TH (NFX) JB PANELRO SCDATE 062490 SCHPRD RT
07/17/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(58 PGS - HART) PF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD RT
07/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(10 PGS/SALAZAR) AD PANEL SCDATE 072590 SCHPRD RT
07/20/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (231 PGS - SALAZAR) SEE 90-24 FOR RT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1990RECORD COMPLETED
02/13/1991ORDER SS, NOS. 89-1505 & 90-24 ARE CONSOL & BRF OF APLT IN NO. 90-24 DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. GW PANELRO SCDATE 012991 SCHPRD CHECK
03/04/1991ORDER SS,CRT'S 2/13/91,ORD IS AMENDD TO EXT THAT BRF OF APLT IN NO. 89-1505 DUE IN 40 DAYS. GW PANELRO SCDATE 031291 SCHPRD BA
04/15/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF IN 89-1505 RJG PANEL SCDATE 041591 SCHPRD BA
05/14/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 10 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 052091 SCHPRD BE
06/18/1991ORDER GR MO OF APLE EXT TM FL BRF, APLE TO FL STATE OF STATUS OF RT W/IN 10 DAYS. AD PANELJAC SCDATE 061291 SCHPRD K
07/01/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLEE REGARDING STATUS OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1991STATEMENT PARTIES STIPULATING TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS TO BE ADDED TO APLT RECORD PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/29/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
08/02/1991ORDER GR STIP FOR THE RT OF 1/26/89 AND 5/17/89 PROC. TO BE ADDED TO APPEAL AS A SR. AD PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 1/26/89 & 5/17/89 PROC. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/24/1992ARGUED before JJ TE KG PY Argument by Thomas T. Heslep, Esq, counsel for appellant Ward; and by Julie G. Weidenbruch, Esq., counsel for appellee.
03/31/1992AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (TE KG PY)
04/21/1992MANDATE ISSUED