judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TAWANNA MARIE BALL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0065
Short Caption:TAWANNA MARIE BALL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Sexual Solicitation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M13857-88Filed Date:01/12/1989

Opening Event Date:01/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/22/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/05/1990
Argued/Submitted:09/07/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/25/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTawanna Marie Ball N
Hastings Jones NN
AppellantUnited StatesN
Sandra K. Levick NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
L. Norman Sanders YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Elizabeth A. BreseeYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BALL, TAWANNA MARIE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 5/11/89 ORD: GRANT MO OF NOTE - 01 COUNSEL FOR APLT TO W/D & NOTE - 02 VACATE APPMT OF HSATINGS JONES NOTE - 02 & APPT SANDRA LEVICK FOR APLT; NOTE - 03 CLK OF SUPER TO PREPARE & NOTE - 03 TRANSMIT REC FORTHWITH. NOTE - 04 11/2/89 ORD: GRANTG MO OF NOTE - 04 SANDRA LEVICK, ESQ. TO W/DRAW; NOTE - 05 APPOINTING L. NORMAN SANDERS, NOTE - 05 ESQ., TO REPRESENT APLT; BRF NOTE - 06 OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 06 COMPLETE TRANSCRIPT.
01/01/1906 JONESH VACATED 5/11/89. LEVICKS VACATED 11/2/89
01/12/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/10/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) HASTINGS JONES, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/21/1989APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 022189 SCHPRD DSA
04/26/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS (APPELLANT) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) SANDRA K. LEVICK, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD R
05/15/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1989RECORD ON APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 061289 SCHPRD R
05/31/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT IS FILED JB PANEL SCDATE 062689 SCHPRD BA
06/22/1989ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING BA UNTIL 40 DAYS AFTER TRANSCRIPT DOCKETED. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1989ORDER GRANT REPORTER'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL RT TO 8/31/89; NFX. MEH PANELMK SCDATE 080189 SCHPRD RT
10/31/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APLT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) L. NORMAN SANDERS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/02/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 04-06. CWC PANELBE SCDATE 110189 SCHPRD GG
11/22/1989FiledRecord Completed
11/22/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/22/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(30 PGS/JANIFER) AD PANEL SCDATE 083189 SCHPRD RT
12/21/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 010290 SCHPRD BA
01/08/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 2/5/90. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 010490 SCHPRD V
02/05/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD BA
03/07/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-5-90 NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 031390 SCHPRD BE
03/15/1990ORDER GRANT APLE'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 4/5/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 031290 SCHPRD V
04/05/1990FiledBriefing Completed
04/05/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 040590 SCHPRD BE
04/23/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR HEARING EN BANC (INITIAL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/14/1990ORDER DENY APLT'S PET FOR INITIAL HRG EN BANC (JUDGE FARRELL IS RECUSED FROM THIS CASE) SL PANELEB SCDATE 042590 SCHPRD VS
09/07/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/07/1990SUBMITTED PANELSCWGGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/04/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AFFIRMING JUDGEMENT ON APPEAL RJG PANELSCWGGA SCDATE 090790 SCHPRD RDEC
10/04/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
10/25/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD