judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LUTHER T. LINZY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0063
Short Caption:LUTHER T. LINZY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M1660-88Filed Date:01/13/1989

Opening Event Date:01/13/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/19/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/15/1989
Argued/Submitted:02/08/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/01/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLuther T. Linzy N
George Jack King YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Geoffrey G. Bestor YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LINZY, LUTHER T. UNITED STATES
01/13/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/23/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/16/1989ORDER APLT TO SHOW CAUSE IN 10 DAYS WHY CASE SHLD NOT BE DIS FOR FAIL TO FL FEE OR FORM 5. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 031389 SCHPRD R
02/22/1989APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER OF 2-16-89 AD PANEL SCDATE 022789 SCHPRD ANSA
03/23/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GEORGE JACK KING, JR., ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989ORDER GEORGE J. KING APPTD FOR APLT; CLK OF SUPER CRT TO TRANSMIT REC FORTHWITH. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD X
05/19/1989FiledRecord Completed
05/19/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1989RECORD ON APPEAL (94 PGS/KACZOROWSKI) AD PANEL SCDATE 042489 SCHPRD R
06/01/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(165 PGS/SIMMS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 28, 1989 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 062889 SCHPRD BA
07/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 7/28/89. DAS PANELRBH SCDATE 062989 SCHPRD CHECK
07/19/1989APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 072889 SCHPRD BA
08/17/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 21ST (NO OPA) JB PANEL SCDATE 082389 SCHPRD BE
09/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/21/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 082889 SCHPRD CHECK
09/15/1989FiledBriefing Completed
09/15/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 092189 SCHPRD BE
09/19/1989MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD WITH EXHIBITS (APPELLANT) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/16/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO SUPP REC & CLK OF SUPER CRT TO FL GOV.EXH 2,3,4,5 & 6 AS SUPP REC. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 101089 SCHPRD Q
10/27/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 102789 SCHPRD M
10/27/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(EXHIBITS) AD PANEL SCDATE 111689 SCHPRD SR
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (109 PGS. -- PIRFO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 IN 89-1096 & 89-944 (237 PGS. -- TREMEL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/08/1990AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1990SUBMITTED PANELNWFEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/08/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/01/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD