judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KERRY N. EDELEN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0815
Short Caption:KERRY N. EDELEN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F8215-86Filed Date:07/10/1987

Opening Event Date:07/10/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/11/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/08/1988
Argued/Submitted:05/17/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/11/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Joy A. Kruse YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901EDELEN, KERRY N. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/05/17 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - KENNEDYM FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - DOHRMANNS FOR - APPELLEE
07/10/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/29/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. PANELPY SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
07/31/1987RECEIVED NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED BY APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/05/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081087 SCHPRD DSA
11/24/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 090987 SCHPRD R
05/11/1988FiledRecord Completed
05/11/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/11/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (478 PGS - BURNS) JB PANEL SCDATE 043088 SCHPRD RT
06/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 20, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 062088 SCHPRD BA
07/20/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/19/88 (NO OPE) GT PANEL SCDATE 072088 SCHPRD BA
07/26/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (35 PGS - BOSTON) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/28/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 8/19/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 072288 SCHPRD V
08/19/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 2ND (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 081988 SCHPRD BA
08/31/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 9/2/88; ANFX. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 082988 SCHPRD CHECK
09/02/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 090288 SCHPRD BA
10/04/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/9/88 (NO OPA) MLR PB PANEL SCDATE 100788 SCHPRD BE
11/03/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 12/8/88 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 110988 SCHPRD BE
11/22/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 12/8/88-NFX. PB PANELRO SCDATE 111688 SCHPRD V
12/08/1988FiledBriefing Completed
12/08/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 120888 SCHPRD BE
04/07/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/17/1989LETTER GRANTING REQ OF APLT FOR ARG ON SUM CAL OF 5/17/89. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 041989 SCHPRD OPE
05/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/03/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL A REPLY BRF & LODGED REPLY BRF IS FILED. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 050489 SCHPRD VS
05/10/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/17/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/17/1989ARGUED PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989AFFIRMED JDGMT AF JDGMT OF CONVICTION PANELRGMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/20/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -PC CITE 560 A.2d 527
06/20/1989OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - PC PAGE # - 1348
07/11/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD