judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RONALD A. ROGERS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0809
Short Caption:RONALD A. ROGERS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5124-86Filed Date:07/09/1987

Opening Event Date:07/09/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/15/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/01/1989
Argued/Submitted:07/18/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/11/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRonald A. Rogers N
John Edward Williams YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Mary A. Terrell YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ROGERS, RONALD A. UNITED STATES
07/09/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 090887 SCHPRD R
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (65 PGS - RUST) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/19/1988ORDER CT RPTR TO COMPLETE & FILE 4/28,5/15-5/19/87 RT BY 8/1/88 ABSO- NFX. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1988FiledRecord Completed
08/15/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/15/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (318 PGS - WATKINS) JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD RT
10/13/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 30 DAYS FROM THE FILING OF THIS MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 092688 SCHPRD BA
11/04/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 11/14/88; NFX. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 110288 SCHPRD V
11/29/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 111488 SCHPRD BA
11/29/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/14/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO LV TO FL BRF, CLK TO FL BRF, APLE BRF DUE IN 30 DAYS. PB PANELRO SCDATE 120688 SCHPRD V
01/13/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 2/13/89 (NO OPA) GT PANEL SCDATE 011389 SCHPRD BE
02/14/1989APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF TIME HAVING EXPIRED BY ONE BUSINESS DAY GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1989RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989FiledBriefing Completed
03/01/1989APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLE FOR LV TO FL BRF & BRF OF APLE FL; SCHED CASE AS SOON AS CAL PERMITS.DS PANELRBH SCDATE 011789 SCHPRD V
03/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3(STIPULATION) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/18/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/18/1989SUBMITTED PANELMKFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION PANELMKFETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JOHN EDWARD WILLIAMS, ESQ. (PETITION FOR CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/20/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
08/11/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/01/1989NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIIN SUPREME COURT (#89-5886) ON 9/19/89 GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/08/1990NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1990LETTER RETURNING EXHIBITS-- LETTER SIZE ENVELOPE MARKED EXHIBITS AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD