judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHNNY L. JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0808
Short Caption:JOHNNY L. JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7110-86Filed Date:07/19/1987

Opening Event Date:07/19/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/26/1989Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/06/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/20/1992
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/21/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Gregory L. Lensbower NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Melissa L. Coretz NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Bernard J. Simbole YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Jennifer M. Anderson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JACKSON, JOHNNY L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 4/24/89 ORD:GRANT MO OF COUNSL NOTE - 01 FOR APLT TO W/D & VACATE APPMT NOTE - 02 OF GREGORY LENSBOWER & APPT NOTE - 02 MELISSA CORETZ FOR APLT; BRF NOTE - 03 OF APLT DUE 40 DAYS AFTER COM- NOTE - 03 PLETE REC IS FILED. NOTE - 04 04/27/90 ORD: APLT'S MO FOR NOTE - 04 STAY GRANTED & THIS APPEAL IS NOTE - 05 HEREBY STAYED PENDING FURTHER NOTE - 05 ORDER OF THIS COURT; F/O NOTE - 06 THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT SHALL NOTE - 06 FL IN 10 DAYS, A COPY OF THE NOTE - 07 MO FILED IN THE TRIAL COURT NOTE - 07 PURSUANT TO D.C. CODE 23-110; NOTE - 08 F/O THAT COUNSEL FOR APLT NOTE - 08 SHALL ADVISE THIS COURT IN 10 NOTE - 09 DAYS AS TO THE STATUS OF THE NOTE - 09 PENDING MO IN THE TRIAL COURT. NOTE - 10 7/22/91 ORD: GR MO OF CNSL FOR NOTE - 10 APLT TO WITHDRAW; APMT OF NOTE - 11 MELISSA L. CORTEZ, ESQ IS NOTE - 11 VACATED; BERNARD J. SIMBOLE, NOTE - 12 ESQ IS NEWLY APPTD TO REPRESEN NOTE - 12 T APLT; ATTY CORTEZ TO TRANS NOTE - 13 ALL DOCUMENTS PERTAINING TO NOTE - 13 APPEAL TO NEW CNSL; CNSL FOR NOTE - 14 APLT TO ADVISE COURT IN 30 AS NOTE - 14 TO STATUS OF PNDNG MO FOR NEW NOTE - 15 TRIAL IN TRIAL CRT. NOTE - 15
01/01/1906 LENSBOWERG VACATED 4/24/89. CORETZM VACATED 7/22/91
07/19/1987NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) GREGORY L. LENSBOWER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073087 SCHPRD CHECK
09/04/1987RECORD ON APPEAL JB PANEL SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD R
09/24/1987ORDER DOCKETING STATE DUE W/IN 10 DAYS. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
10/14/1987ORDER COUNSEL FOR APLT IN 10 DAYS TO FILE DSA OR APPNTMNT WILL BE VACATED & MATTER REF TO BPR. PANELPY SCDATE 100587 SCHPRD DSA
10/22/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 102687 SCHPRD DSA
02/21/1989COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APPELLANT'S COUNSEL & TO APPOINT MELISSA CORETZ AS COUNSEL FOR APLT RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(13 PGS/ARTIS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) MELISSA L. CORETZ, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/24/1989ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01-03. DAS PANELMK SCDATE 031789 SCHPRD Q
04/14/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (69 PGS TRANSCRIPT-TREMEL) MLR PANEL SCDATE 070289 SCHPRD RT
06/16/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (82 PGS. -- GRAYBILL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 063089 SCHPRD RT
07/06/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4(145 PGS/WATKINS) AD PANEL SCDATE 070389 SCHPRD RT
07/18/1989ORDER DENY MO TO EXT TM TO PREPARE RT; RT DUE IN 10 DAYS. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 070189 SCHPRD RT
12/26/1989ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/26/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(322 PGS/MITCHELL) AD PANEL SCDATE 072889 SCHPRD RT
12/26/1989RECORD COMPLETED
02/05/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 4-5-90 AD PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD BA
03/07/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRIEF WITHIN 30 DAYS; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD V
04/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF APPEAL AD PANEL SCDATE 040690 SCHPRD BA
04/27/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 4 THRU 9 GW PANELRO SCDATE 042390 SCHPRD V
05/04/1990RECEIVED COPY OF MOTION TO VACATE JMT & FOR NEW TRIAL FILED IN TRIAL COURT RJG PANEL SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD CHECK
05/29/1990STATEMENT TO APRIL 27, 1990 COURT'S ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 052890 SCHPRD STATE
07/12/1990ORDER DIRG COUNSEL FOR APLT TO FILE STMT RE STATUS OF PENDING MOT W/IN 10 DAYS. FVH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/24/1990APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO COURT'S JULY 12, 1990 ORDER AD PANEL SCDATE 072390 SCHPRD ANSA
09/04/1990ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDING MO IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRO SCDATE 082990 SCHPRD V
10/04/1990STATEMENT OF APLT STATUS OF PENDING MOTION IN TRAIL COURT AJ PANEL SCDATE 100490 SCHPRD STATE
11/19/1990ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO ADVISE THIS CRT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDING MO FL IN TRL CRT.GW PANELRO SCDATE 110790 SCHPRD V
12/20/1990STATEMENT OF APLT STATUS OF TRIAL COURT MOTION AD PANEL SCDATE 121990 SCHPRD ANSA
02/13/1991ORDER COUNS FOR APLT TO FL A STMNT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO STATUS OF PENDG MO FL IN TRL CRT. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 020691 SCHPRD V
03/15/1991STATEMENT OF APLT LOWER COURT AJ PANEL SCDATE 031291 SCHPRD STATE
05/08/1991ORDER APLT SHALL ADVISE CT W/IN 30 DAYS AS TO THE STATUS OF OF PENDING MO IN TR CT. AD PANELRBH SCDATE 050391 SCHPRD K
06/10/1991STATEMENT RE ORDER DATED 5/8/91 PMB PANEL SCDATE 060791 SCHPRD ANSA
07/17/1991COUNSEL'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FOR BUSINESS REASONS OF APLT PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNARD J. SIMBOLE, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/22/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIEDS 10-15. EVH PANELRO SCDATE 071891 SCHPRD V
08/16/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER (8/7/91 - J. KRAMER)) PR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/16/1991STATEMENT OF APPELLANT RE: STATUS OF 23-110 MOTION RJG PANEL SCDATE 083091 SCHPRD STATE
08/20/1991RECEIVED LTR FROM MS. CURLEY RE CORRECTED PGS 282 - 291 OF THE TRANSCRIPTS PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/18/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1991APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 11/6/91 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 102291 SCHPRD BE
10/22/1991ORDER GRT APLE MO X TM TO FL BRF TO 11/06/91. NFX. JJ PANELJAC SCDATE 101691 SCHPRD B
11/06/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 110691 SCHPRD BE
11/06/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/20/1992FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/20/1992ARGUED JJ ST SC KN Bernard J. Simbole, Esq. for appellant; Jennifer M. Anderson, Esq. for appellee.
04/30/1992MANDATE ISSUED
05/21/1992MANDATE ISSUED