judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LAVELLE N. HAWKINS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1517
Short Caption:LAVELLE N. HAWKINS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6808-88Filed Date:12/26/1989

Opening Event Date:12/26/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/11/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/29/1991
Argued/Submitted:04/11/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/16/1992

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLavelle N. Hawkins N
Anthony S. Haughton YN
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
Robert J. SpagnolettiYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAWKINS, LAVELLE N. UNITED STATES
01/01/1902
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/04/11 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - HAUGHTONA FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - SPAGNOLETTIR FOR - APPELLEE
12/26/1989NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/08/1990ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS. GG PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/18/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 011890 SCHPRD DSA
01/19/1990DESIGNATION OF RECORD AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990RECEIVED REPORTER'S CERTIFICATION FROM GRAYBILL - 9/6/89 PROCEEDING (ORDERED IN ERROR) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 022790 SCHPRD R
05/04/1990RECEIVED CT RPTR MITCHELL CERTIFICATION OF 9/7/89 - 9/8/89 PROCEEDING (DUP REQUEST) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/22/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (290 PGS. -- MITCHELL) RJG PANEL SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD RT
06/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (132-PGS/GRAYBILL) AJ PANEL SCDATE 051790 SCHPRD RT
06/11/1990RECORD COMPLETED
10/04/1990ORDER BRIEF OF APPELLANT SHALL BE FILED W/IN 40 DYS FROM DATE OF ORDER (REC COMPLETE) JB PANELRBH SCDATE 092690 SCHPRD CHECK
11/13/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 30 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 111390 SCHPRD BA
11/21/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FL BRF TO 12/13/90; NFX. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 111590 SCHPRD GR
12/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121390 SCHPRD BA
12/14/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/14/1991RECEIVED APLE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991APPELLANT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991APPELEE'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/29/1991ORDER GRNT APLT MO LV FL LODGED BRF FO LODGD APL BRF FLD. CASE SCHED FOR CONSDN. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 010991 SCHPRD GR
01/29/1991BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/27/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF NO OPPO AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/27/1991RECEIVED APLT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/11/1991ARGUED PANELRGBETE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/11/1991ORDER GRANT APLT'S MOT FOR LV TO FL LODGED REPLY BRIEF. MEH PANELROBETE SCDATE 040191 SCHPRD VS
04/11/1991APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF MEH PANEL SCDATE 050891 SCHPRD CHECK
04/03/1992AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION (RG TE BE)
04/16/1992APLT MO TO EXTEND TIME TO FL PETITION FOR REH/EB to 5/1/92.
04/23/1992ORD GRT APLT MO TO EXT TM TO FL PET FOR REH/REH EBto May 1, 1992. (RO)
05/01/1992APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC
05/08/1992ORDER directing appellee within 20 days from the date of this order to file a response to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. (RO)
05/28/1992APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to June 11th.
06/01/1992ORD GRT APLE MO TO EXT TM TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to June 11, 1992. (RO)
07/20/1992APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN OPPOSITION to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.
07/20/1992RECEIVED appellee's opposition to petition for rehearing en banc.
07/24/1992ORD GRANT APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE OPPOSITION and Clerk is directed to file the lodged opposition to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. (RO)
07/24/1992APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION to petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc
10/06/1992ORD DENY APPELLANT'S PETITION FOR REH/REH EN BANC (Judge Farrell has recused himself from this case) Chief Judge Rogers voted to grant rehearing en banc. (EB)
10/16/1992MANDATE ISSUED