judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGE R. DAVIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1495
Short Caption:GEORGE R. DAVIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1459-87Filed Date:12/20/1989

Opening Event Date:12/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/23/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/03/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeorge R. Davis N
Vincent A. JankoskiNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DAVIS, GEORGE R. UNITED STATES
12/20/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/02/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) VINCENT A. JANKOSKI, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/03/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD DSA
02/23/1990FiledRecord Completed
02/23/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/23/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (50 PGS/SWARINGER) AD PANEL SCDATE 021990 SCHPRD R
03/20/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 4, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 040490 SCHPRD BA
03/28/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRIEF TO 5/4/90; NFX. GW PANELDDW SCDATE 032190 SCHPRD V
04/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(ORDER JUDGE WEISBER DATED 4/13/90) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL AS MOOT RJG PANEL SCDATE 050490 SCHPRD BA
08/03/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
08/03/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1990ORDER GRANTG APLT'S MO TO DISMISS; DISMISSING APPEAL AS MOOT. CWC PANELFETESC SCDATE 051590 SCHPRD RT
08/03/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PC CITE