judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES L. WILSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1503
Short Caption:JAMES L. WILSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5314-89Filed Date:12/12/1989

Opening Event Date:12/12/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/05/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/27/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/14/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:07/19/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames L. Wilson N
Richard A. SeligmanYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Thomas G. Connolly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WILSON, JAMES L. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 7/15/91 ORD: GRT APLT'S MO TO NOTE - 01 RECALL MANDATE AND THE MANDATE NOTE - 02 ISSUED 5/30/91 IS HEREBY NOTE - 02 RECALLED AND THE CLK OF THE NOTE - 03 SUP. CT. IS DIRTD TO TRANSMIT NOTE - 03 SAME TO THE CLK OF THIS COURT NOTE - 04 FORTHWITH. FURTH ORD THAT NOTE - 04 FURTHER ISSUANCE OF THE NOTE - 05 MANDATE IS STAYED IN NOTE - 05 ACCORDANCE WITH RULE 41(B).
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/02/14 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - SELIGMANR FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - CONNOLLYT FOR - APPELLEE
12/12/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/02/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD SELIGMAN, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD DSA
03/05/1990FiledRecord Completed
03/05/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC AD PANEL SCDATE 021290 SCHPRD R
08/13/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1990RECEIVED COPY OF MO TO FORWARD RECORD TO COURT OF APPEALS FOR DOCKETING AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1990RECEIVED COPY OF MO TO SUPP. RECORD ON APPEAL FILED IN SUP. CT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/14/1990APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/27/90 (NO OPPO) AJ PANEL SCDATE 091790 SCHPRD BE
09/24/1990ORDER GRNT APLE MO X TM TO FILE BRF TO 09-27-90. NFX GR PANEL SCDATE 091990 SCHPRD GR
09/27/1990FiledBriefing Completed
09/27/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 092790 SCHPRD BE
10/02/1990ORDER 9/24/90 ORD IS AMENDED TO REFLECT THE CAPTION SHOULD READ JAMES L. WILSON V. U.S. PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/11/1990APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/26/1990ORDER GRNT APLT MO TO X TM FL REPLY BRF. RBA SHALL BE FLD W/IN 10 DYS FRM DT OF ORD. NFX. GR PANELRBH SCDATE 101290 SCHPRD GR
10/26/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 110590 SCHPRD RBA
01/10/1991APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1991LETTER GRANT APLT'S (1/10/91) REQUEST TO PRESENT ORAL ARGUMENT CT. PANELFF SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1991MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING BE TO DIVISION. MEH PANELRBH SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/06/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(59 PGS/JANIFER) #2(29 PGS/SCHOCH) MEH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/14/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/14/1991ARGUED PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/15/1991SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(50 PGS/SCHOCH) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1991AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF IN PART TRIAL CT JUDGMENT/DISMISSING APPEAL IN PART/AS SET FORTH IN OPINION PANELRGTESC SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1991APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) RICHARD SELIGMAN, ESQ. (PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERT.) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/08/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -RO CITE 590 A.2d 1002 (AF IN PART/DS IN PART)
05/08/1991OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - RO PAGE # - 1227
05/30/1991MANDATE ISSUED (RECALLED 7/15/91) PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1991NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIIN US SUPREME COURT FILED 5/28/91 #90-8151 RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/19/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION APLT MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES PMB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1991MANDATE RECALLED SEE ORDER DATED 7/15/91 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/15/1991ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 THRU 5 SL PANELRO SCDATE 070591 SCHPRD TO
07/18/1991MISCELLANEOUS SUBSTANTIVE MOTION APPELLEE'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO ISSUE THE MANDATE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/19/1991ORDER GRANT APLE'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO ISSUE MANDATE FORTHWITH. MEH PANELROTESC SCDATE 071891 SCHPRD VS