judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH RAY BROWN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1504
Short Caption:JOSEPH RAY BROWN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10194-89Filed Date:12/28/1989

Opening Event Date:12/28/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/18/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/23/1990
Argued/Submitted:12/04/1990
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/01/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph Ray Brown N
Thomas T. HeslepYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
David A. Payne YN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROWN, JOSEPH RAY UNITED STATES
12/28/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/02/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS T. HESLEP, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD DSA
02/23/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (47 PGS/PIRFO) AD PANEL SCDATE 022090 SCHPRD R
05/16/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (476-PGS/SWARINGER) AJ PANEL SCDATE 050990 SCHPRD RT
05/18/1990FiledRecord Completed
05/18/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/26/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 26, 1990 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 052690 SCHPRD CHECK
07/03/1990ORDER GRANT APLT'S MO TO EXT TM TO FILE BRF TO 7/26/90; NFX. GW PANELRBH SCDATE 062790 SCHPRD V
07/26/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 072690 SCHPRD BA
08/23/1990FiledBriefing Completed
08/23/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 083190 SCHPRD BE
12/04/1990FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/04/1990SUBMITTED PANELTEFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF SUPERIOR COURT JUDGMENT PANELTEFAMK SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/10/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
02/01/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD