judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD E. CHASE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1499
Short Caption:DONALD E. CHASE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5566-89Filed Date:12/20/1989

Opening Event Date:12/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/11/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/10/1990
Argued/Submitted:02/07/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/15/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonald E. Chase N
Bernard Jay Williams YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CHASE, DONALD E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 9/24/90 ORD: BRF OF APLT DUE NOTE - 01 BY 11/09/90; BRF OF APLE DUE NOTE - 02 BY 12/14/90; REPLY BRF DUE BY NOTE - 02 1/2/91; NFX
12/20/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/02/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) BERNARD JAY WILLIAMS, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AJ PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD DSA
02/27/1990RECORD ON APPEAL (RTC) RJG PANEL SCDATE 021990 SCHPRD R
07/11/1990FiledRecord Completed
07/11/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(348 PGS/JACKSON) AD PANEL SCDATE 050290 SCHPRD RT
09/24/1990ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 01 - 02 FOR ADVANCE BRIEFING SCHEDULE GR PANELRBH SCDATE 081690 SCHPRD GR
10/05/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (12-PGS/JACKSON) AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/06/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 110990 SCHPRD BA
12/10/1990FiledBriefing Completed
12/10/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 121490 SCHPRD BE
12/19/1990APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 010291 SCHPRD RBA
02/07/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/07/1991SUBMITTED PANELBEFAPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELBEFAPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/22/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
03/15/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD