judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEWIS C. ADAMS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1498
Short Caption:LEWIS C. ADAMS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F5868-89Filed Date:12/20/1989

Opening Event Date:12/20/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/26/1990Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/18/1990
Argued/Submitted:01/04/1991
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/30/1991

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLewis C. Adams N
Jonathan S. ZuckerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
James N. Plamondon YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ADAMS, LEWIS C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1905TRDATE- 91/01/04 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - ZUCKERJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - PLAMONDONJ FOR - APPELLEE
12/20/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/02/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JONATHAN ZUCKER, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/17/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 011290 SCHPRD DSA
02/22/1990RECORD ON APPEAL RTC (14 PGS/BURNS) AD PANEL SCDATE 021990 SCHPRD R
05/01/1990MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF RPTR FARMER TO EXT TIME TO FILE 10/31/89 - 11/1/89 PROC. TO JUNE 18, 1990 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/10/1990ORDER GRANT RPTR FARMER EXTENSION TO FILE 10/31/89 - 11/1/89 PROC., RT DUE BY JUNE 18TH (NFX) JB PANELRO SCDATE 050790 SCHPRD RT
06/26/1990FiledRecord Completed
06/26/1990ACTION SLIP MAILED AD PANEL SCDATE 070590 SCHPRD CHECK
06/26/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(643 PGS/FARMER) AD PANEL SCDATE 061890 SCHPRD RT
08/07/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 40 DAYS AJ PANEL SCDATE 080690 SCHPRD BA
08/28/1990ORDER GRT APLT MO X TM TO FL BRF ONLY TO EXTENT THAT BRF BE FL BY 9/6/90. NFX. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 082390 SCHPRD B
09/06/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR ONE WEEK AD PANEL SCDATE 090690 SCHPRD BA
09/17/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/17/1990RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1990APPELLANT'S BRIEF JJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/12/1990ORDER GRT APLT MOS X TM & MO FOR LV TO FL LODGED BRF; APLE'S BRF DUE W/IN 30 DAYS. JJ PANELRBH SCDATE 100590 SCHPRD B
10/18/1990FiledBriefing Completed
10/18/1990APPELEE'S BRIEF AJ PANEL SCDATE 111290 SCHPRD BE
12/10/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/13/1990LETTER GRANTING APLT'S REQUEST TO ARGUE ON 1/4/91 AT 9:30 AM. MEH PANELFF SCDATE 122090 SCHPRD CHECK
01/04/1991FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/04/1991ARGUED PANELTEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/07/1991AFFIRMED MOJ AF SUPERIOR COURT JUDGMENT PANELTEFAGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/07/1991DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
01/30/1991MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD