judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEVEN C. MURRAY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0822
Short Caption:STEVEN C. MURRAY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3613-86Filed Date:07/15/1987

Opening Event Date:07/15/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:04/04/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/30/1988
Argued/Submitted:04/12/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/06/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSteven C. Murray N
James W. KleinNY
Kenneth B. Nunn YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Bruce Delaplaine YN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MURRAY, STEVEN C. UNITED STATES
01/01/1904JUDGE - FA AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 89/04/12 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - NUNNK FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - DELAPLAINEB FOR - APPELLEE
07/15/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/31/1987RECEIVED NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED BY APPELLANT JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/03/1987ORDER APPOINTING JAMES KLEIN, ESQ. AS COUNSEL FOR APLT. DOCKETING STATEMENT DUE IN 10 DAYS PANELPY SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/05/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 081387 SCHPRD DSA
08/06/1987ORDER SUA SPONTE, DISMISSING 87-864 AS A DUPLICATE OF THIS CASE. CWC PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/06/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDERED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/09/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PB PANEL SCDATE 091487 SCHPRD R
12/08/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(420 PGS. -- SANBORN) RJG PANEL SCDATE 100987 SCHPRD RT
01/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF UNTIL AFTER COMPLETION OF TRANSCRIPTS RJG (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD BA
04/04/1988FiledRecord Completed
04/04/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/04/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (176 PGS - SWARINGER) JB PANEL SCDATE 031188 SCHPRD RT
05/16/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JUNE 15TH (NO OPPO) JB PB PANEL SCDATE 051688 SCHPRD BA
06/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO JULY 15TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 061588 SCHPRD BA
07/01/1988ORDER GRT APLT MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 7/15/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD V
07/15/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 8/1/88 (NO OPE) MLH PANEL SCDATE 071588 SCHPRD BA
07/26/1988ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 8/1/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 071888 SCHPRD V
07/27/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (24 PGS RT - SWARINGER) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/01/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD BA
09/06/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO OCTOBER 6, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 090688 SCHPRD BE
10/06/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO NOVEMBER 7TH (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 100688 SCHPRD BE
10/28/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 11/7/88-NFX. PB PANELPY SCDATE 101788 SCHPRD CHECK
11/08/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF RJG PB PANEL SCDATE 110788 SCHPRD BE
11/08/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1988FiledBriefing Completed
11/30/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 112888 SCHPRD V
03/14/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (PRO SE) ADDENDUM TO BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S (PRO SE) ADDENDUM TO BRIEF GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1989ORDER SS, CLK TO FL LODGED PRO SE ADDENDUM TO APLT'S BRF. DAS PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/30/1989APPELLANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM PRO SE ADDENDUM TO APLT'S BRF. DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/31/1989RECEIVED APPELLANTS REPLY BRIEF AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT LATE (NO OPE) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/07/1989ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & CLK TO FL REPLY BRF. DAS PANELNWBEPY SCDATE 040489 SCHPRD VS
04/07/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/12/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/12/1989ARGUED PANELNWBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989AFFIRMED MOJ AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL PANELNWBEPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/26/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
05/10/1989MOTION TO EXT TM TO FILE PET FOR REH/REH EN BANC OF APPELLANT, PRO SE RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/16/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MOTION AND APLT'S PET FOR REH/REH EB SHALL BE FILED W/I 30 DAYS SL PANELRO SCDATE 052289 SCHPRD OPE
06/07/1989PETITION FOR REHEARING/REHEARING EN BANC GT PANEL SCDATE 061589 SCHPRD MRRB
06/19/1989ORDER THAT APLE W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH EB (10 COPIES) SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/10/1989SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5(ORDER) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
07/25/1989MEMORANDUM ORDER OF 6/19/89 RESENT TO APLE, RESPONSE DUE 8/14 SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/02/1989APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO (PRO SE) PETITION FOR REHEARNG/REHEARING EN BANC JB PANEL SCDATE 080289 SCHPRD OPE
09/06/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD