judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEROY E. JAMES, JR. V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0821
Short Caption:LEROY E. JAMES, JR. V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Lead: 87-CF-0804 Consolidated:87-CF-0821
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F64-86Filed Date:07/17/1987

Opening Event Date:07/17/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/22/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/03/1988
Argued/Submitted:03/21/1989
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/13/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantLeroy E. James, Jr.N
Eugene M. Bond YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JAMES JR., LEROY E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: WILBERT BROOKINGS NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 12/22/87 ORD: THE APPTMT OF NOTE - 02 STEVEN WEINBERG, ESQ., AS NOTE - 03 COUNSEL TO REPRESENT APLT IN NOTE - 03 NO. 87-1101 IS HEREBY VACATED NOTE - 04 AND APPEAL NO. 87-1101 IS NOTE - 04 HEREBY DISMISSED. FO THAT NOTE - 05 APLT'S BRIEF IN NO. 87-821 NOTE - 05 SHALL BE FILED 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 06 THE RECORD INCL. REPORTER'S NOTE - 06 TRANSCRIPT IS FILED W/COURT. NOTE - 07 CON 87-804 NOTE - 07
07/17/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) EUGENE M. BOND, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
12/22/1987FiledRecord Completed
12/22/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 2 THRU 6 SL PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 091687 SCHPRD R
06/21/1988ORDER SS, CONS 87-804 & 87-821; APLT BR IN 87-821 DUE IN 40 DAYS & CON APLE BR DUE 30 AFT. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 062188 SCHPRD BE
06/29/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF JB PANEL SCDATE 080188 SCHPRD BA
07/29/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO 9/1/88 GT (EBP) PANEL SCDATE 080288 SCHPRD BE
09/01/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO SEPTEMBER 29TH JB PB PANEL SCDATE 090188 SCHPRD BE
09/20/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2(7 PGS/ RAMOS) AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/03/1988FiledBriefing Completed
10/03/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/21/1989FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/21/1989SUBMITTED PANELNWSCKN SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/23/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/23/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
04/13/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD