judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD E. LEE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0810
Short Caption:RICHARD E. LEE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F10936-86Filed Date:07/10/1987

Opening Event Date:07/10/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/13/1988Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/03/1988
Argued/Submitted:12/06/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/30/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRichard E. Lee N
Thomas M. Slawson YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LEE, RICHARD E. UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: JAMES ANTHONY SMITH NOTE - 01
07/10/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) THOMAS M. SLAWSON, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/21/1987APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT JB PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
08/31/1987RECORD ON APPEAL RJG PANEL SCDATE 090987 SCHPRD R
01/13/1988FiledRecord Completed
01/13/1988ACTION SLIP MAILED JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1988SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (243 PGS - FRANKLIN) JB PANEL SCDATE 090187 SCHPRD RT
02/11/1988APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 022288 SCHPRD BA
03/14/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO APRIL 13TH MLH (PB) PANEL SCDATE 031488 SCHPRD BE
04/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO MAY 11, 1988 RJG PANEL SCDATE 041388 SCHPRD BE
05/03/1988ORDER GRT APLE MO FO EXT OF TM TO FL BRF TO 5/11/88-NFX PB PANELPY SCDATE 042888 SCHPRD V
05/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF MLH PB PANEL SCDATE 051188 SCHPRD BE
05/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/01/1988RECEIVED LETTER DATED 2/25/88 FROM APPELLANT, PRO SE MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/03/1988FiledBriefing Completed
06/03/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 060288 SCHPRD V
06/21/1988LETTER TO COUNSEL FOR APLT SL PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
06/28/1988APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO LETTER DATED 6/21/88 FROM COURT TO COUNSEL MLH PANEL SCDATE 070188 SCHPRD ANS
12/06/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/06/1988SUBMITTED PANELRGMKRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988AFFIRMED MOJ AF CONVICTION ON APPEAL PANELRGMKRY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/09/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -MOJ JUDGE -PC CITE
12/30/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD