judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DONALD TOWNSEND V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 87-CF-0811
Short Caption:DONALD TOWNSEND V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1877-82Filed Date:06/23/1987

Opening Event Date:06/23/1987Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/14/1987Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/02/1988
Argued/Submitted:09/19/1988
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/06/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDonald Townsend N
Jefferson M. Gray YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Mary Ellen Abrecht YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901TOWNSEND, DONALD UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 CODEF: CASH WALKER III & NOTE - 01 ANTHONY PIXLEY NOTE - 02 092587 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO NOTE - 02 FOR LV TO FILE DSA CLK TO FILE NOTE - 03 LDGD DSA; GRANT MO OF APLT FOR NOTE - 03 EXT ONLY TO EXTENT THAT THE BR NOTE - 04 OF APLT IS DUE 40 DAYS AFTER NOTE - 04 RT IS FILED W/THIS COURT. NOTE - 05 11/4/88 OP: APPELLEE'S MOTION NOTE - 05 TO STRIKE NON-RECORD MATERIAL NOTE - 06 FROM APPELLANT'S VOLUME OF NOTE - 06 APPENDICES IS DENIED & APPELLA NOTE - 07 NT'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE NOTE - 07 RECORD IS GRANTED.
01/01/1904JUDGE - TE AUTHOR - RECUSED - Y
01/01/1905TRDATE- 88/09/19 ACTION - ARG ATTY 1 - GRAYJ FOR - APPELLANT ATTY 2 - ABRECHTM FOR - APPELLEE
06/23/1987FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/13/1987DESIGNATION OF RECORD RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/13/1987APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) JEFFERSON GRAY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 073187 SCHPRD CHECK
08/20/1987MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION OF APPELLANT TO EXTEND TIME FOR 30 DAYS TO FILE TRANSCRIPT (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/20/1987RECORD ON APPEAL PM PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD R
09/11/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATE- MENT RJG PANEL SCDATE 082487 SCHPRD DSA
09/16/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS RJG PANEL SCDATE 092187 SCHPRD CHECK
09/25/1987ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 083187 SCHPRD CHECK
10/09/1987SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (31 PGS - GLEASON) GG PANEL SCDATE 101587 SCHPRD RT
10/14/1987FiledRecord Completed
10/14/1987ACTION SLIP MAILED GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/20/1987APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF TO DECEMBER 1ST (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 112387 SCHPRD BA
12/01/1987RECEIVED APPELLANT'S BRIEF & (SEP) AP- PENDIX MLH PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/10/1987APPELLANT'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/10/1987ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT TO EXT TM TO FL BRF & CLK TO FL BA; BRF OF APLE DUE IN 30 DAYS. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 120187 SCHPRD SL
12/18/1987RECEIVED APPENDICES TO APPELLANT'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/04/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION TO STRIKE NON-RECORD MATERIAL FROM APLT'S VOLUME OF APPENDICES JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/12/1988APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OUT OF TIME PB PANEL SCDATE 011188 SCHPRD BE
01/12/1988RECEIVED APPELLEE'S BRIEF PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/20/1988RECEIVED APLT'S OPPOSITION TO APLE'S MOTION TO STRIKE PB PANEL SCDATE 011888 SCHPRD OPA
01/29/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT TO FEBRUARY 22ND (NO OPPO) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/02/1988FiledBriefing Completed
02/02/1988APPELEE'S BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/10/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT TO FEBRUARY 22, 1988 (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/19/1988APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF OF APPELLANT FOR A ONE-WEEK EXTENSION (NO OPPO) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/01/1988RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (MXRBA STILL PENDING) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/15/1988ORDER GRANT MO OF APLT FOR LV TO FL REPLY BRF & CLK TO FL RBA. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 021888 SCHPRD Q
04/15/1988APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DAS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/12/1988LETTER OF APPELLEE PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
08/17/1988MEMORANDUM TRANSMITTING CITATION PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) TO DIV. DAS PANELDDW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
09/19/1988FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/19/1988ARGUED PANELSTSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL (SEE NOTE FIELDS 5-7) PANELSTSCGA SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/04/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -OPN JUDGE -GA CITE 549 A.2d 724
11/04/1988OPINION TYPE M JUDGE - GA PAGE # - 2337
11/21/1988APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY MANDATE AND TO EXTEND TIME TO TO FILE PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/02/1988ORDER GRT MO AND PET FOR REH EN BANC SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 12/19/88 (NFX) SL PANELRO SCDATE 120588 SCHPRD OPE
12/19/1988ORDER JB PANEL SCDATE 121988 SCHPRD MRBA
01/11/1989ORDER APLE W/I 20 DAYS TO FILE RESPONSE TO PET FOR REH EB (10 COPIES) SL PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1989APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC TO FEBRUARY 14TH JB PANEL SCDATE 013189 SCHPRD ANSE
02/06/1989ORDER GRT APLE'S MO AND THE OPPO TO PET FOR REH EB SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEF 2/14/89 (NFX) SL PANELRO SCDATE 021389 SCHPRD OPA
02/10/1989APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 021489 SCHPRD OPE
02/22/1989APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION TO APLT'S PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/03/1989RECEIVED APPELLANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSI- TION TO PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC MLR PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/09/1989ORDER GRT APLT'S MO FOR LV TO FILE RESPONSE TO OPPO TO PET & CLK IS DIRTD TO FILE LODGED REPLY PANELEB SCDATE 031089 SCHPRD CHECK
03/09/1989APPELLANT'S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO PET FOR REHEARING EN BANC SL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/06/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/15/1989NOTICE OF FILING A PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARIFILED IN U.S. SUPREME COURT ON 5/10/89 (88-7188) GT PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD Denied