judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLAUDETTE WASHINGTON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CM-0118
Short Caption:CLAUDETTE WASHINGTON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M6565-88Filed Date:01/31/1989

Opening Event Date:01/31/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/31/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WASHINGTON, CLAUDETTE UNITED STATES
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 NOT BE DISMISSED AS HAVING NOTE - 01 BEEN NOTED FROM A NON-FINAL NOTE - 02 ORDER. SEE KWAYKE V. DC, 494 NOTE - 02 A.2D 643 (DC 1985)
01/31/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/16/1989ORDER DIRECTING APLT W/IN 10 DAYS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY APPEAL SHOULD (SEE NOTE FIELDS 1 & 2) FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/10/1989ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL AS HAVING BEEN NOTED FROM A NON-FINAL ORDER. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/10/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
03/31/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD