judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

UNITED STATES V. MICHAEL T. TURNER

Case Information: 89-CM-0076
Short Caption:UNITED STATES V. MICHAEL T. TURNERClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7445-86Filed Date:01/18/1989

Opening Event Date:01/18/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/25/1989

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeMichael T. Turner N
Abraham C. BlitzerNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901UNITED STATES TURNER, MICHAEL T.
01/18/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/28/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, W/IN 10 DAYS, TO FILE DOCKETING STATEMENT FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/18/1989ORDER DIRG APLT, ON OR BEF 4/26/89, TO COMPLY WITH 3/28/89 ORDER OR APPEAL SHALL BE DISMSD. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
05/04/1989ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR APLT'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH 3/28/89 ORDER. FVH PANELRO SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
05/04/1989DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
05/25/1989MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD