judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES M. POPE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 89-CF-1522
Short Caption:JAMES M. POPE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F13424-89Filed Date:12/29/1989

Opening Event Date:12/29/1989Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/19/1990

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames M. Pope N
David A. Sidbury NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901POPE, JAMES M. UNITED STATES
12/29/1989FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/24/1990APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) DAVID A. SIDBURY, ESQ. PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/05/1990APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT AD PANEL SCDATE 020590 SCHPRD DSA
03/07/1990RECORD ON APPEAL AJ PANEL SCDATE 022890 SCHPRD R
03/08/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL OF APLT'S AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1990APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND TO SET ASIDE ORDER FOR PRETRIAL DETENTION W/OUT BOND AD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/15/1990APPELLEE'S REPLY TO REMAND TO SET ASIDE AJ PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/28/1990SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1(24 PGS/WRAY) AD PANEL SCDATE 051690 SCHPRD RT
03/29/1990FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/29/1990ORDER GRT APLT'S MO TO REMAND & THIS CASE IS HEREBY REMANDED TO THE SUP. CT. FOR FURTHER PROC. MEH PANELRO SCDATE 031390 SCHPRD TMC
03/29/1990DISP NO - 01 DISP - RM METH -ORD JUDGE -RO CITE
04/19/1990MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD