judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CHRISTOPHER HENDERSON V. DAFNEY CREWS

Case Information: 10-CV-0888
Short Caption:CHRISTOPHER HENDERSON V. DAFNEY CREWSClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6122-09Filed Date:07/14/2010

Opening Event Date:07/14/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:Y
Briefs Completed:07/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/26/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:01/09/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantChristopher Henderson YPro SeN
AppelleeDafney Crews NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/14/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/18/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on July 14, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC) elp
09/07/2010MOT TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE STMT RE TRANSCRIPT
09/28/2010 On consideration of the appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the statement regarding transcript, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the statement regarding transcript shall be filed with this court within 30 day from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (JAC) elp
10/12/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 4/13/10, 6/21/10, 6/23/10 & 8/27/10) (elp) (IFP status was subsequently granted by the trial court) ta
10/12/2010RECEIVED- aplts motion for appeal transcript (RT-NEEDED/RT-REQUESTED for 4/13/10, 6/21/10, 6/23/10 & 8/27/10) (elp)
10/25/2010STATEMENT- from aplt re: case on appeal
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (143-pgs/tape 6/21/10 proc.)
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#2 (137-pgs/ronan 6/21-23/10 proc.)
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#3 (14-pgs/tape 6/23/10 proc.)
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#4 (46-pgs/tape 4/13/10 proc.)
01/26/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#5 (47-pgs/tape 8/27/10 proc.)w/cd
01/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/01/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
02/01/2011RECORD INDEX
02/01/2011RECORD COPIES
03/01/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days
03/07/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL w/o prejudice
03/29/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and the limited appendix, and appellee's motion to dismiss appeal, to which no oppositions have been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion for an extension of time is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed with this court on or before April 13, 2011. It is (MORE)
03/29/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that appellee's motion to dismiss appeal is denied. (ETW) elp
04/07/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days.
04/21/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the limited appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 13, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
05/11/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/11/2011APPENDIX
05/18/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (59-pgs/tape 10/29/10 proc.)w/cd
06/20/2011 It appearing that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix were filed with this court on May 11, 2011, and it further appearing that the brief of appellee was due to be filed on or before June 15, 2011, (See D.A. App. R. 31), but the brief has not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellee shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, submit the brief, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure to either timely file the brief or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC) elp
07/25/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte that this appeal shall be scheduled for consideration before a merits division of this court on the record and on appellant's brief alone.
07/25/2011FiledBriefing Completed
08/12/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/26/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Farrell
02/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Oberly and Beckwith, Associate Judges, and farrell, Senior Judge.)
03/09/2012FiledMotion To Reconsider w/ a petition for rehearing en banc attached (Appellant)Denied
09/14/2012FiledORDERED that appellant's pro se motion to reconsider and petition for rehearing en banc are denied.
01/09/2013FiledMandate