judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO MILLER

Case Information: 38099
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO MILLERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D259285Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:09/17/2002 at 1:30 PMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:09/17/2002How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/28/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Returned check no. 3451 to Law Offices of Buche and Garcia--no filing fee due.
06/28/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-10996
07/05/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: July 16, 2001. 01-12445
08/09/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-13498
08/13/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed August 9, 2001. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on July 30, 2001. 01-13743
08/13/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-12810
09/24/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. 01-16092
10/09/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 26, 2001. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 01-17003
10/09/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-17005
11/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 9, 2001, appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief and appendix and a transcript request form for the transcripts conducted on March 26, 2001. We admonish appellant's counsel for not complying with the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure by filing an untimely transcript request form. We grant appellant's unopposed motion. Appellant shall have 30 days from the filing of the requested transcript to file the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted except upon demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. Because we granted appellant's motion for an extension of time, we disapprove the parties stipulation filed on September 24, 2001 as moot. 01-18832
01/15/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 02-01026
02/13/2002TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: March 26, 2001. Court Reporter: Arlene Blazi. 02-02865
02/14/2002MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 02-02955
02/25/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 02-03503
03/04/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On January 15, 2002, Transcript/Video Services, filed a motion for an extension of time to prepare the transcript requested by appellant. The requested transcript was filed on February 13, 2002. Accordingly, we deny the motion for an extension of time to file the transcript as moot. On November 13, 2001, this court entered an order granting appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file and serve the opening brief and appendix by March 15, 2002. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRPA 31(a)(2). On February 14, 2002, respondent filed a motion to dismiss this appeal, due to "Appellant's failure to file an Opening Brief in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(2) and the Order of this Court file [sic] November 13, 2001." As noted above, our order of November 13, 2001, directed appellant to file and serve the opening brief and appendix by March 15, 2001. Thus the opening brief and appendix are not late, and appellant has not failed to comply with our November 13, 2001, order. Accordingly, we deny respondent's motion to dismiss. 02-03908
03/08/2002BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 03/07/02. Signed by: Alfonso E. Garcia. 02-04221
03/08/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 10 days.
03/18/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Amended Appellant's Appendix. 02-04790
04/03/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Request to File Amended Opening Brief. 02-05931
04/11/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Additional Time to Respond. 02-06477
04/15/2002BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 04/12/02. Signed by: Kathryn Bliss Holt. 02-06688
04/15/2002AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 02-06689
05/08/2002Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
05/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Resolving Motions. On March 18, 2002, appellant filed an amended appendix to the opening brief. We grant the motion filed on April 3, 2002. The clerk of this court shall file the amended opening brief received on April 3, 2002. On April 11, 2002, respondent filed a motion requesting an extension of time to file the answering brief. On April 15, 2002, the answering brief was timely received and filed. We deny as moot the motion requesting an extension of time. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply brief, if deemed necessary. 02-08514
05/15/2002BriefFiled Amended Brief. Amended Appellant's Opening Brief. Signed by Alfonso E. Garcia. 02-05932
06/12/2002Case Status Update Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed.
08/21/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on September 17, 2002, at 1:30 p.m. (SNP03-MS/ML/NB)
09/03/2002Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
09/17/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP03-MS/ML/NB
10/23/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Reversal. fn8[Given our conclusion on this issue, we need not reach Natalie's claims that the district court erred in concluding that termination of her rights was in her children's best interests or that her due process rights were violated. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED." SNP03-MS/ML/NB 02-18344
11/19/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-18833
11/19/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/20/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 21, 2002. 02-18833