judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDREW LARSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-34)
Case Number:06-34Case Docketed On:02/17/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ANDREW LARSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ANDREW LARSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAndrew Joseph Larson Pro Se
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Paul S. Rehurek
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 14
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/17/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/17/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/05/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/06/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/19/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/28/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/28/2006Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/03/2006Event - Phone Call. Received call from public defender; substitute counsel intends to file Anders Brief. Appellant will be filing motion for new counsel.EventPhone CallFinal
08/04/2006Brief - Anders; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAndersFinal
08/04/2006Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
08/04/2006Event - Phone Call. Called counsel and left message for record.EventPhone CallFinal
08/07/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal. Faxed request for record.Notice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/07/2006Record - Received unfiled recordRecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
08/11/2006Event - Phone Call. Called district court clerk and requested confidential file.EventPhone CallFinal
08/14/2006Record - Received unfiled record (Confidential file)RecordReceived unfiled recordFinal
08/22/2006Order - Other. Order denying permission for court-appointed cousel to withdraw and ordering counsel to file either an adequate anders brief or a brief addressing the merits of this appeal.OrderOtherFinal
08/22/2006Notice-Outgoing - Other. Sent letter to counsel with a copy of order above and the record.Notice-OutgoingOtherFinal
08/22/2006System - Record checked-out. Sent to Megan L. Hayes to prepare supplemental brief.SystemRecord checked-outFinal
08/25/2006Service - Certified mail signature return card (for record to counsel)ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
08/29/2006Brief - Supplemental appellant (Anders)BriefSupplemental appellantFinal
08/29/2006System - Record checked-in (Megan L. Hayes).SystemRecord checked-inFinal
09/22/2006Order - Allowing court appointed counsel to withdraw, conditionally affirming judgment and sentenceOrderAllowing court appointed counsel to withdrawFinal
10/09/2006Correspondence - Incoming from Andrew J. Larson to Chief Justice Voigt (treated as a motion for appointment of counsel.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/24/2006Order - Denying request for appointment of counsel.OrderDenyFinal
10/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief (letter treated as a motion)MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/31/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
12/15/2006Brief - Appellant. (letter, treated as a brief)BriefAppellantFinal
01/22/2007Correspondence - Incoming. Received copy of letter sent to court reporter re transcripts. No action taken.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/25/2007Opinion - Published order. Order affirming judgment and sentence of the District Court.OpinionPublished orderFinal
02/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/12/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/12/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/13/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal