judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DELEON VS. DELEON

Case Information: 38120
Short Caption:DELEON VS. DELEONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A386544Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/09/2001 / Berkson, LesterSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Peter N. Reynolds, Esq.--check no. 138.
07/05/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-11276
07/05/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/09/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/27/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-16301
09/27/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-16302
10/10/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 01-17025
10/10/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
10/11/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Peter N. Reynolds. Returned unfiled, the original Docketing Statement received on August 27, 2001, with a copy of the Order Dismissing Appeal filed October 10, 2001.