judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAUL A. STORMS and SUSAN E. STORMS v. DIANA C. MORRIS

Case Heading (06-35)
Case Number:06-35Case Docketed On:02/24/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:PAUL A. STORMS and SUSAN E. STORMS v. DIANA C. MORRIS
Full Title:PAUL A. STORMS and SUSAN E. STORMS, Appellants (Defendants), v. DIANA C. MORRIS, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul A. StormsM. Jalie Meinecke
AppellantSusan E. StormsM. Jalie Meinecke
AppelleeDiana C. MorrisMary Helen Reed

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/24/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/24/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/24/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/24/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/07/2006Order - Dismiss - jurisdictionOrderDismiss - jurisdictionFinal
03/16/2006Motion - Reinstatement; and brief in support of their motion for reinstatement.MotionReinstatement of caseFinal
03/29/2006Response/Objection - Motion. Objection to appellants' motion for reinstatement pursuant to W.R.A.P. 15; and filed brief in support of objection.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
04/04/2006Order - Denying motion for reinstatement of appeal.OrderDenyFinal
04/04/2006Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal