judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PEDRO J. PETROVIC V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-0906
Short Caption:PEDRO J. PETROVIC V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF1-28189-08Filed Date:07/19/2010

Opening Event Date:07/19/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/14/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/05/2012
Argued/Submitted:10/10/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/10/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPedro J. PetrovicY
Stanley E. Baritz NN
Jonathan R. FellnerYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Mark A. AzizYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
07/19/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
08/04/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Craig Moore, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
08/04/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Craig Moore, Esquire
09/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
09/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (66 pgs/Van Bremen) 4/12/10 proc.
09/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (204 pgs/Van Bremen) 4/13/10 proc.
09/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (211 pgs/Van Bremen) 4/14/10 proc.
09/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (410 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 4/19-21/10 proc.
09/13/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (7 pgs/Coney) 4/22/10 proc. CD Attached
09/16/2010RECORD INDEX
09/16/2010RECORD COPIES
09/16/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (Superior Court pleadings)(SEALED)
11/04/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (15 pgs/tape) 4/5/10 proc. w/cd
12/30/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (17 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 7/16/10 proc. w/cd
01/14/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#9 (135-pgs/van bremen 4/15/10 proc.)
01/14/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/20/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 90 days. no oppo
03/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 30, 2011. (JAC)
03/29/2011APPEARANCE - of Stanley Baritz and Jonathan R. Fellner counsels for the aplt
04/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until August 31, 2011 (no oppo)
04/12/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to recommend aplt to stay in the local jail for 30 days
05/05/2011ORDERED, ss, that the appointment of Craig Moore, Esquire is hereby vacated. Craig Moore, Esquire, shall transmit all documents pertaining to this appeal to the newly-retained counsel forthwith. It is ( M O R E )
05/05/2011 F/O that the motion of newly retained counsel for court to recommend Mr. Petrovic's stay in the local jail for 30 days is denied without prejudice to filing a motion with the Superior Court judge pursuant to D.C. Super. Ct. Crim. R. 38(b)(2011). It is ( M O R E )
05/05/2011 F/O that appellant's motion for extension of time is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 31, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (ETW)
08/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to 10/31/11.
10/31/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/10/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
11/22/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File Appendix (Appellant)Granted
11/22/2011FiledAppendix to Brief (Appellant)
12/01/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to file the lodged appendix.
12/21/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
01/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 2/3/12.
01/26/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until March 5, 2012 (Appellee)Granted
02/02/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 3/5/12.
03/05/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
03/05/2012FiledBriefing Completed
03/20/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
03/28/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant)
03/30/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant) to 5/15/12
04/06/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
05/15/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/10/2012FiledArgued before Judges Glickman, Thompson, Pryor Jonathan R. Fellner, Esq. for appellant Mark A. Aziz, Esq. for appellee
11/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Judges Glickman, Thompson, Pryor)
12/10/2012FiledMandate