Case: 01-06-00348-CV
01-06-00348-CV
04/20/2006
Miscellaneous/other civil
Max Kunz
Wayne H. Paris
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/17/2007 | Mandate issued | | |||||
12/07/2006 | Motion for rehearing due | | |||||
11/22/2006 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismiss appeal |
| ||||
09/10/2006 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |||||
08/28/2006 | Appellant's brief past due. If not filed court may dismiss | | |||||
08/09/2006 | Appellant's brief due | | |||||
07/27/2006 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | | ||||
07/21/2006 | Motion filing fee paid. | | |||||
07/21/2006 | Motion to extend time to file brief - fee received | | |||||
07/21/2006 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
07/05/2006 | No Court Reporter Record to be filed in this case. | | |||||
07/05/2006 | No Court Reporter Record to be filed in this case. | | |||||
06/22/2006 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |||||
06/13/2006 | Record has been checked out. | | |||||
06/12/2006 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |||||
06/12/2006 | Response due to a motion or Court's Order. | | |||||
06/09/2006 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |||||
06/09/2006 | Supplemental Clerks Record Filed | | |||||
06/09/2006 | 37.3 Notice record is past due | | |||||
06/08/2006 | Appellate filing fee paid. | | |||||
05/23/2006 | Docketing Statement past due. Notice sent to parties | | |||||
05/23/2006 | Appellate filing fee due or appeal may be dismissed | | |||||
05/22/2006 | Motion filing fee due. Notice sent this date. | | |||||
05/17/2006 | Record due 120 days after judgment signed; postjudgment motion/request for FFCL filed (TRAP 26.1(a), 35.1(a)) | | |||||
05/10/2006 | Filing fee due per our notice/order. | | |||||
05/05/2006 | Docket Statement Due per our Docketing Order | | |||||
04/20/2006 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |||||
04/19/2006 | Notice of appeal filed | | |||||
02/16/2006 | Motion for new trial filed in trial court (civil Tex. R. Civ. P. 329b, criminal TRAP 21) | | |||||
01/17/2006 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/17/2013 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
08/16/2008 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Paris, Wayne H. | Appellee | Wayne H. Paris |
Kunz, Max | Appellant | Robert W. Higgason |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
Honorable Lynn Bradshaw-Hull
809156